EP3068331 - SURGICAL REFERENCING DEVICE AND SURGICAL NAVIGATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/38] | SURGICAL REFERENCING DEVICE, SURGICAL NAVIGATION SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
[2021/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aesculap AG Am Aesculap-Platz 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [2021/33] |
Former [2016/38] | For all designated states Aesculap AG Am Aesculap-Platz 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PFEIFER, Tobias Seedorfer Strasse 16 78713 Waldmössingen / DE | 02 /
BROERS, Holger Landrideweg 26670 Uplengen-Spols / DE | 03 /
BENEKE, Sascha Königstrasse 77 26835 Holtland-Nücke / DE | [2016/38] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/38] | Application number, filing date | 14795631.2 | 07.11.2014 | [2016/38] | WO2014EP74019 | Priority number, date | DE201310112375 | 11.11.2013 Original published format: DE102013112375 | [2016/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015067743 | Date: | 14.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3068331 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3068331 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B90/00 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B1/044 (US);
A61B5/06 (US);
A61B90/39 (EP,US);
A61B17/8061 (US);
A61B17/84 (US);
A61B2034/2051 (US);
A61B2034/2055 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3945 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/38] | A61B34/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE REFERENZIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND CHIRURGISCHES NAVIGATIONSSYSTEM | [2021/13] | English: | SURGICAL REFERENCING DEVICE AND SURGICAL NAVIGATION SYSTEM | [2021/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉFÉRENCEMENT CHIRURGICAL ET SYSTÈME DE NAVIGATION CHIRURGICAL | [2021/13] |
Former [2016/38] | CHIRURGISCHE REFERENZIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, CHIRURGISCHES NAVIGATIONSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2016/38] | SURGICAL REFERENCING DEVICE, SURGICAL NAVIGATION SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
Former [2016/38] | DISPOSITIF DE RÉFÉRENCEMENT CHIRURGICAL, SYSTÈME DE NAVIGATION CHIRURGICAL ET PROCÉDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/38] | 08.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.11.2014 | AL | 18.08.2021 | CY | 18.08.2021 | CZ | 18.08.2021 | DK | 18.08.2021 | EE | 18.08.2021 | ES | 18.08.2021 | FI | 18.08.2021 | HR | 18.08.2021 | IT | 18.08.2021 | LT | 18.08.2021 | LV | 18.08.2021 | MC | 18.08.2021 | MK | 18.08.2021 | NL | 18.08.2021 | PL | 18.08.2021 | RO | 18.08.2021 | RS | 18.08.2021 | SE | 18.08.2021 | SI | 18.08.2021 | SK | 18.08.2021 | SM | 18.08.2021 | AT | 07.11.2021 | IE | 07.11.2021 | LU | 07.11.2021 | BG | 18.11.2021 | NO | 18.11.2021 | GR | 19.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | CH | 30.11.2021 | LI | 30.11.2021 | IS | 18.12.2021 | PT | 20.12.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | HU | 07.11.2014 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 07.11.2021 | ||
IE | 07.11.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 07.11.2014 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 07.11.2021 | ||
IE | 07.11.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 07.11.2021 | ||
IE | 07.11.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
IE | 07.11.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 18.08.2021 | |
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 18.08.2021 | |
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | DK | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | ES | 18.08.2021 | |
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | ES | 18.08.2021 | |
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 18.08.2021 | |
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 18.08.2021 | |
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 18.08.2021 | |
NO | 18.11.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004106861 (LEITNER FRANCOIS [FR]) [A] 1-33* the whole document *; | [X]EP1518508 (ZIMMER ORTHOPAEDIC SURGICAL PR [US]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]EP2198801 (BRAINLAB AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * figure - *; | [XI]WO2011023232 (BRAINLAB AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,21,33 * the whole document * [I] 3-20,22-32; | [XI]EP2298215 (STRYKER LEIBINGER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-4,21,22,33 * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0079]; figures 1,8-12 * [I] 5-20,23-32; | [X]WO2011113482 (BRAINLAB AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2012068679 (CLARON TECHNOLOGY INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document * [I] 3,6-20 | Examination | EP2179692 |