EP3060189 - IMMERSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSN medical GmbH Quickbornstrasse 24 20253 Hamburg / DE | [2017/11] |
Former [2016/35] | For all designated states BSN Medical GmbH Quickbornstrasse 24 20253 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUSCHEK, Christoph, V Flurstrasse 20 40764 Langenfeld / DE | [2016/35] | Representative(s) | FARAGO Patentanwälte GmbH Thierschstraße 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/35] | Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Philipsstrasse 8 52068 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 14795974.6 | 24.10.2014 | [2016/35] | WO2014EP72844 | Priority number, date | DE20131017524 | 24.10.2013 Original published format: DE102013017524 | [2016/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015059273 | Date: | 30.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3060189 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3060189 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61H35/00 | [2016/35] | CPC: |
A61H33/14 (EP,US);
A61H35/00 (EP,US);
A61H35/006 (EP,US);
A61K9/0009 (EP,US);
A61M35/30 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61H2033/048 (EP,US);
A61H2230/255 (EP,US);
A61H2230/505 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0275 (US);
A61M2205/12 (US);
A61M2205/36 (US);
A61M2210/08 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINTAUCHVORRICHTUNG | [2016/35] | English: | IMMERSION DEVICE | [2016/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMMERSION | [2016/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/35] | 28.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.10.2014 | AL | 09.05.2018 | CY | 09.05.2018 | CZ | 09.05.2018 | DK | 09.05.2018 | EE | 09.05.2018 | ES | 09.05.2018 | FI | 09.05.2018 | HR | 09.05.2018 | IT | 09.05.2018 | LT | 09.05.2018 | LV | 09.05.2018 | MC | 09.05.2018 | MK | 09.05.2018 | MT | 09.05.2018 | PL | 09.05.2018 | PT | 09.05.2018 | RO | 09.05.2018 | RS | 09.05.2018 | SI | 09.05.2018 | SK | 09.05.2018 | SM | 09.05.2018 | TR | 09.05.2018 | BG | 09.08.2018 | NO | 09.08.2018 | GR | 10.08.2018 | IS | 09.09.2018 | IE | 24.10.2018 | LU | 24.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 24.10.2014 | |
AL | 09.05.2018 | ||
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
MK | 09.05.2018 | ||
MT | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PT | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IE | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
MT | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PT | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IE | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
MT | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IE | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
MT | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IE | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IE | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | CZ | 09.05.2018 | |
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IE | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | CZ | 09.05.2018 | |
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | CZ | 09.05.2018 | |
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 09.05.2018 | |
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | CZ | 09.05.2018 | |
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 09.05.2018 | |
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CZ | 09.05.2018 | |
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 09.05.2018 | |
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO02074223 (AHN SHIN YOUNG [KR], et al) [X] 45-52,60,61 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03003989 (CERAMATEC INC [US]) [X] 45-52,60,61 * page 3, line 12; figure 1 *; | [X]US2013096490 (PELKUS ADRIAN [US]) [X] 45-52,60,61 * abstract ** figures 1, 3B *; | [X] - OPLANDER C ET AL, "A new method for sustained generation of ultra-pure nitric oxide-containing gas mixtures via controlled UVA-photolysis of nitrite solutions", NITRIC OXIDE: BIOLOGY AND CHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 23, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.NIOX.2010.08.001, ISSN 1089-8603, (20101215), pages 275 - 283, (20100814), XP027430288 [X] 45-52,60,61 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.niox.2010.08.001 | by applicant | US5396882 | WO9507610 | WO9746853 | DE19823748 | US2003039697 | US6673338 | US7105502 | US7122529 | EP1903003 | US2013224083 | - K.D. KRÖNCKE; K. FEHSEL; V. KOLB-BACHOFEN, "Inducible nitric oxide synthase in human diseases", CLIN EXP IMMUNOL, (1998), vol. 113, pages 147 - 56 | - K. MATSUNAGA; R.F. FURCHGOTT, "Responses of rabbit aorta to nitric oxide and superoxide generated by ultraviolet irradiation of solutions containing inorganic nitrite", J PHARMACOL EXP THER, (1991), vol. 259, pages 1140 - 6 | - M. FISCHER; P. WARNECK, "Photodecomposition of nitrite and undissociated nitrous acid in aqueous solution", J.PHYS.CHEM., (1996), vol. 100, pages 18749 - 18756 | - H. STREHLOW; I. WAGNER, "Flash photolysis in aqueous nitrite solutions", Z. PHYS. CHEM. NF, (1982), vol. 132, pages 151 - 160 | - S. FRANK; H. KAMPFER; C. WETZLER; J. PFEILSCHIFTER, "Nitric oxide drives skin repair: novel functions of an established mediator", KIDNEY INT, (2002), vol. 61, doi:doi:10.1046/j.1523-1755.2002.00237.x, pages 882 - 8, XP009093154 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1523-1755.2002.00237.x | - S. FRANK; B. STALLMEYER; H. KAMPFER; N. KOLB; J. PFEILSCHIFTER, "Nitric oxide triggers enhanced induction of vascular endothelial growth factor expression in cultured keratinocytes (HaCaT) and during cutaneous wound repair", FASEB J, (1999), vol. 13, pages 2002 - 14 | - S. FRANK; H. KAMPFER; M. PODDA; R. KAUFMANN; J. PFEILSCHIFTER, "Identification of copper/zinc superoxide dismutase as a nitric oxide- regulated gene in human (HaCaT) keratinocytes: implications for keratinocyte proliferation", BIOCHEM J, (2000), vol. 346, pages 719 - 28 | - K. YAMASAKI; H.D. EDINGTON; C. MCCLOSKY; E. TZENG; A. LIZONOVA; I. KOVESDI; D.L. STEED; T.R. BILLIAR, "Reversal of impaired wound repair in iNOS-deficient mice by topical adenoviral-mediated iNOS gene transfer", J CLIN INVEST, (1998), vol. 101, pages 967 - 71 | - J. PFEILSCHIFTER; W. EBERHARDT; A. HUWILER, "Nitric oxide and mechanisms of redox signalling: matrix and matrix-metabolizing enzymes as prime nitric oxide targets", EUR J PHARMACOL, (2001), vol. 429, pages 279 - 86 | - Y. ISHII; T. OGURA; M. TATEMICHI; H. FUJISAWA; F. OTSUKA; H. ESUMI, "Induction of matrix metalloproteinase gene transcription by nitric oxide and mechanisms of MMP-1 gene induction in human melanoma cell lines", INT J CANCER, (2003), vol. 103, pages 161 - 8 | - M.B. WITTE; F.J. THORNTON; D.T. EFRON; A. BARBUL, "Enhancement of fibroblast collagen synthesis by nitric oxide.", NITRIC OXIDE, (2000), vol. 4, pages 572 - 82 | - F. VERRECCHIA; A. MAUVIEL, "TGF-beta and TNF-alpha: antagonistic cytokines controlling type 1 collagen gene expression", CELL SIGNAL, (2004), vol. 16, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cellsig.2004.02.007, pages 873 - 80, XP055155955 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cellsig.2004.02.007 | - D.A. SIWIK; W.S. COLUCCI, "Regulation of matrix metalloproteinases by cytokines and reactive oxygen/nitrogen species in the myocardium", HEART FAIL REV, (2004), vol. 9, doi:doi:10.1023/B:HREV.0000011393.40674.13, pages 43 - 51, XP019207286 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/B:HREV.0000011393.40674.13 | - "Antioxidant actions of nitric oxide", V.M. DARLEY-USMAR; R.P. PATEL; V.B. O'DONNELL; B.A. FREEMAN, Nitric Oxide: Biology and Pathobiology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (2000), pages 265 - 276 | - S.P. GOSS; B. KALYANARAMAN; N. HOGG, "Antioxidant effects of nitric oxide and nitric oxide donor compounds on low-density lipoprotein oxidation", METHODS ENZYMOL, (1999), vol. 301, pages 444 - 53 | - D.A. WINK; J.A. COOK; R. PACELLI; J. LIEBMANN; M.C. KRISHNA; J.B. MITCHELL, "Nitric oxide (NO) protects against cellular damage by reactive oxygen species", TOXICOL LETT, (1995), vol. 82-83, pages 221 - 6 | - B. BRÜNE; A. VON KNETHEN; K.B. SANDAU, "Nitric oxide (NO): an effector of apoptosis", CELL DEATH DIFFER, (1999), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1038/sj.cdd.4400582, pages 969 - 75, XP009005853 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.cdd.4400582 | - D. MOELLERING; J. MCANDREW; R.P. PATEL; T. CORNWELL; T. LINCOLN; X. CAO; J.L. MESSINA; H.J. FORMAN; H. JO; V.M. DARLEY-USMAR, "Nitric oxide-dependent induction of glutathione synthesis through increased expression of gamma-glutamylcysteine synthetase", ARCH BIOCHEM BIOPHYS, (1998), vol. 358, pages 74 - 82 | - U. FORSTERMANN; M. NAKANE; W.R. TRACEY; J.S. POLLOCK, "Isoforms of nitric oxide synthase: functions in the cardiovascular system", EUR HEART J, (1993), vol. 14, pages 10 - 5 | - P. HE; M. ZENG; F.E. CURRY, "Effect of nitric oxide synthase inhibitors on basal microvessel permeability and endothelial cell [Ca2+]i", AM J PHYSIOL, (1997), vol. 273, pages H747 - 55 | - M. TOBOREK; S. KAISER, "Endothelial cell functions. Relationship to atherogenesis", BASIC RES CARDIOL, (1999), vol. 94, pages 295 - 314 | - M. KELM; B. STRAUER, "Endotheliale Dysfunktion", THERAPEUTISCHE UND PROGNOSTISCHE RELEVANZ. INTERNIST., (1999), vol. 40, pages 1300 - 1307 | - T.P. AMADEU; A.B. SEABRA; M.G. DE OLIVEIRA; A.M. COSTA, "S-nitrosoglutathionecontaining hydrogel accelerates rat cutaneous wound repair", J EUR ACAD DERMATOL VENEREOL, (2007), vol. 21, pages 629 - 37 | - R. WELLER; M.J. FINNEN, "The effects of topical treatment with acidified nitrite on wound healing in normal and diabetic mice", NITRIC OXIDE, (2006), vol. 15, doi:doi:10.1016/j.niox.2006.04.002, pages 395 - 9, XP024919022 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.niox.2006.04.002 | - A.B. SHEKHTER; V.A. SEREZHENKOV; T.G. RUDENKO; A.V. PEKSHEV; A.F. VANIN, "Beneficial effect of gaseous nitric oxide on the healing of skin wounds", NITRIC OXIDE, (2005), vol. 12, doi:doi:10.1016/j.niox.2005.03.004, pages 210 - 9, XP004903036 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.niox.2005.03.004 | - W.S. MCDONALD; T.P. LO, JR.; M. THURMOND; C. JONES; R. COHEN; A. MILLER; D. BEASLEY, "Role of nitric oxide in skin flap delay", PLAST RECONSTR SURG, (2004), vol. 113, pages 927 - 31 | - C. BEIGE; P.B. MASSION; M. PELAT; J.L. BALLIGAND, "Nitric oxide and the heart: update on new paradigms", ANN N Y ACAD SEI, (2005), vol. 1047, pages 173 - 82 | - B. GASTON, "Summary: systemic effects of inhaled nitric oxide", PROC AM THORAC SOC, (2006), vol. 3, pages 170 - 2 | - T.M. DAWSON; S.H. SNYDER, "Gases as biological messengers: nitric oxide and carbon monoxide in the brain", J NEUROSCI, (1994), vol. 14, pages 5147 - 59 | - C.C. MILLER; M.K. MILLER; A. GHAFFARI; B. KUNIMOTO, "Treatment of chronic nonhealing leg ulceration with gaseous nitric oxide: a case study", J CUTAN MED SURG, (2004), vol. 8, doi:doi:10.1007/s10227-004-0106-8, pages 233 - 8, XP002568914 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10227-004-0106-8 | - A. GHAFFARI; D.H. NEIL; A. ARDAKANI; J. ROAD; A. GHAHARY; C.C. MILLER, "A direct nitric oxide gas delivery system for bacterial and mammalian cell cultures", NITRIC OXIDE, (2005), vol. 12, doi:doi:10.1016/j.niox.2005.01.006, pages 129 - 40, XP004807515 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.niox.2005.01.006 | - A. GHAFFARI; C.C. MILLER; B. MCMULLIN; A. GHAHARY, "Potential application of gaseous nitric oxide as a topical antimicrobial agent", NITRIC OXIDE, (2006), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1016/j.niox.2005.08.003, pages 21 - 9, XP024918977 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.niox.2005.08.003 | - A. GHAFFARI; R. JALILI; M. GHAFFARI; C. MILLER; A. GHAHARY, "Efficacy of gaseous nitric oxide in the treatment of skin and soft tissue infections", WOUND REPAIR REGEN, (2007), vol. 15, pages 368 - 77 | - Z.S. GALIS; J.J. KHATRI, "Matrix metalloproteinases in vascular remodeling and atherogenesis: the good, the bad, and the ugly", CIRC RES, (2002), vol. 90, pages 251 - 62 | - S.C. TYAGI; M.R. HAYDEN, "Role of nitric oxide in matrix remodeling in diabetes and heart failure", HEART FAIL REV, (2003), vol. 8, pages 23 - 8 | - J. PFEILSCHIFTER; W. EBERHARDT; K.F. BECK, "Regulation of gene expression by nitric oxide", PFLUGERS ARCH, (2001), vol. 442, doi:doi:10.1007/s004240100586, pages 479 - 86, XP001145554 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s004240100586 | - R. ZAMORA; Y. VODOVOTZ; K.S. AULAK; P.K. KIM; J.M. KANE; L. ALARCON; D.J. STUEHR; T.R. BILLIAR, "A DNA microarray study of nitric oxide-induced genes in mouse hepatocytes: implications for hepatic heme oxygenase-1 expression in ischemia/reperfusion", NITRIC OXIDE, (2002), vol. 7, pages 165 - 86 | - J. HEMISH; N. NAKAYA; V. MITTAL; G. ENIKOLOPOV, "Nitric oxide activates diverse signaling pathways to regulate gene expression", J BIOL CHEM, (2003), vol. 278, pages 42321 - 9 | - M. ZICHE; L. MORBIDELLI; E. MASINI; S. AMERINI; H.J. GRANGER; C.A. MAGGI; P. GEPPETTI; F. LEDDA, "Nitric oxide mediates angiogenesis in vivo and endothelial cell growth and migration in vitro promoted by substance P", J CLIN INVEST, (1994), vol. 94, doi:doi:10.1172/JCI117557, pages 2036 - 44, XP002455988 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI117557 | - S.J. LEIBOVICH; P.J. POLVERINI; T.W. FONG; L.A. HARLOW; A.E. KOCH, "Production of angiogenic activity by human monocytes requires an L-arginine/nitric oxide-synthasedependent effector mechanism", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1994), vol. 91, pages 4190 - 4 | - N.S. BRYAN; B.O. FERNANDEZ; S.M. BAUER; M.F. GARCIA-SAURA; A.B. MILSOM; T. RASSAF; R.E. MALONEY; A. BHARTI; J. RODRIGUEZ; M. FEELI, "Nitrite is a signaling molecule and regulator of gene expression in mammalian tissues", NATURE CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (2005), vol. 1, pages 290 - 297 |