EP3091973 - LIPID COMPOSITION FOR IMPROVING BODY COMPOSITION DURING CATCH-UP GROWTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL | [2016/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DER BEEK, Eline Marleen Uppsalalaan 12 NL-3584 CT Utrecht / NL | 02 /
ABRAHAMSE-BERKEVELD, Marieke Uppsalalaan 12 NL-3584 CT Utrecht / NL | 03 /
TELLER, Inga Christiane Uppsalalaan 12 NL-3584 CT Utrecht / NL | [2016/46] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2016/46] | Application number, filing date | 14796306.0 | 03.11.2014 | [2016/46] | WO2014NL50761 | Priority number, date | EP20130191300 | 01.11.2013 Original published format: EP 13191300 | [2016/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015065193 | Date: | 07.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3091973 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3091973 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/20 | [2016/46] | CPC: |
A61K31/20 (EP,BR,US);
A23L33/115 (EP,BR,RU,US);
A61K9/167 (US);
A23L33/12 (BR,RU);
A23L33/17 (EP,RU,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,RU,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/332, A23V2250/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LIPIDZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER KÖRPERZUSAMMENSETZUNG WÄHREND DES AUFHOLWACHSTUMS | [2016/46] | English: | LIPID COMPOSITION FOR IMPROVING BODY COMPOSITION DURING CATCH-UP GROWTH | [2016/46] | French: | COMPOSITION LIPIDIQUE POUR AMÉLIORER LA COMPOSITION CORPORELLE PENDANT LA CROISSANCE DE RATTRAPAGE | [2018/09] |
Former [2016/46] | COMPOSITION LIPIDIQUE POUR AMÉLIORER UNE COMPOSITION DE CORPS PENDANT UNE CROISSANCE DE RATTRAPAGE | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/46] | 13.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18188920.5 / EP3466277 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.11.2014 | AL | 15.08.2018 | CY | 15.08.2018 | EE | 15.08.2018 | FI | 15.08.2018 | HR | 15.08.2018 | LT | 15.08.2018 | LV | 15.08.2018 | MC | 15.08.2018 | MK | 15.08.2018 | RO | 15.08.2018 | RS | 15.08.2018 | SK | 15.08.2018 | SM | 15.08.2018 | LU | 03.11.2018 | MT | 03.11.2018 | NO | 15.11.2018 | IS | 15.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/08] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
LU | 03.11.2018 | ||
MT | 03.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
LU | 03.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 15.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XDI]WO2010027259 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al); | [XI]WO2012173467 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al); | [XI]US2013052297 (VAN DE HEIJNING HUBERTUS JOSEPHUS MARIA [NL], et al); | [A]EP2583562 (NESTEC SA [CH]) | by applicant | WO9844917 | WO2005063050 | WO2007039596 | WO2010027259 | WO2010027258 | WO2010134810 | WO2012173486 | WO2013135738 |