EP3063077 - SEALING CAP FOR A CONTAINER CLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schütz GmbH & Co. KGaA Schützstraße 12 56242 Selters / DE | [2016/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLATT, Bernd Nordstrasse 23 56412 Ruppach-Goldhausen / DE | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Bahnhofstrasse 4 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/36] | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bahnhofstrasse 4 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 14796404.3 | 11.09.2014 | [2016/36] | WO2014DE200468 | Priority number, date | DE201310221976 | 29.10.2013 Original published format: DE102013221976 | [2016/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015062595 | Date: | 07.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3063077 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3063077 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B65D51/18, B65D41/58 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
B65D51/18 (EP,CN,US);
B65D39/025 (US);
B65D39/082 (EP,US);
B65D41/32 (CN);
B65D41/58 (EP,US);
B65D55/0863 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIEGELKAPPE FÜR EINEN BEHÄLTERVERSCHLUSS | [2016/36] | English: | SEALING CAP FOR A CONTAINER CLOSURE | [2016/36] | French: | CAPUCHON OBTURATEUR POUR UNE FERMETURE DE RÉCIPIENT | [2017/28] |
Former [2016/36] | CAPUCHON OBTURATEUR POUR FERMETURE DE CONTENANT | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 29.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.12.2017 | CY | 13.12.2017 | EE | 13.12.2017 | HR | 13.12.2017 | LT | 13.12.2017 | LV | 13.12.2017 | MC | 13.12.2017 | MK | 13.12.2017 | MT | 13.12.2017 | PT | 13.12.2017 | RS | 13.12.2017 | SI | 13.12.2017 | SK | 13.12.2017 | SM | 13.12.2017 | GR | 14.03.2018 | IS | 13.04.2018 | LU | 11.09.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MK | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
LU | 11.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
LU | 11.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
LU | 11.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
LU | 11.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | HR | 13.12.2017 | |
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 |