EP2997979 - POLYMERIC MICELLE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NanoCarrier Co., Ltd. 144-15 Chuo 226-39 Wakashiba Kashiwa Chiba 277-0871 / JP | [2016/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Yasuki c/o NanoCarrier Co. Ltd. 144-15 Chuo 226-39 Wakashiba Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0871 / JP | 02 /
HARADA, Mitsunori c/o NanoCarrier Co. Ltd. 144-15 Chuo 226-39 Wakashiba Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0871 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Ryosuke c/o NanoCarrier Co. Ltd. 144-15 Chuo 226-39 Wakashiba Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0871 / JP | [2016/12] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2016/12] | Application number, filing date | 14797011.5 | 16.05.2014 | [2016/12] | WO2014JP63020 | Priority number, date | JP20130105465 | 17.05.2013 Original published format: JP 2013105465 | [2016/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014185504 | Date: | 20.11.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2997979 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/34, A61K9/107, A61K31/337, A61K47/48 | [2016/41] | CPC: |
A61K47/34 (EP,US);
A61K9/107 (US);
A61K31/337 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (US);
A61K47/50 (US);
A61K47/645 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/12] | A61K47/34, A61K9/107 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT POLYMEREN MIZELLEN | [2016/12] | English: | POLYMERIC MICELLE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION | [2016/12] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE À BASE DE MICELLES POLYMÈRES | [2016/12] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2015 | Translation filed | 12.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 12.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 15.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010221320 (KATO YASUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * claim 1 ** paragraphs [0054] , [0 59] , [0 65] , [0 32] * | International search | [X]WO2010013836 (NANOCARRIER CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]WO2011096558 (NANOCARRIER CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]JP2011162452 (NANO CAREER KK) | by applicant | WO9632434 | WO9633233 | WO9706202 | WO2009142326 | WO2010013836 |