EP2996568 - SYSTEMS FOR DELIVERING BONE CONDUCTION STIMULI TO AND FOR MEASURING GRAVITATION RECEPTOR FUNCTIONS OF THE INNER EAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/12] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DELIVERING BONE CONDUCTION STIMULI TO AND FOR MEASURING GRAVITATION RECEPTOR FUNCTIONS OF THE INNER EAR | ||
[2020/20] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ear And Skull Base Center, P.C. 1225 NE 2nd Avenue Suite 305 Portland, OR 97232 / US | [2016/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WACKYM, Phillip, Ashley 1225 NE 2nd Avenue Suite 305 Portland, OR 97232 / US | 02 /
WACKYM, Ashton, Rhys 1225 NE 2nd Avenue Suite 305 Portland, OR 97232 / US | [2016/12] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/12] | Atkinson, Jennifer Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14797206.1 | 13.05.2014 | [2016/12] | WO2014US37917 | Priority number, date | US201361822694P | 13.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361822694 P | [2016/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014186408 | Date: | 20.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2996568 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B9/00, A61B10/00, A61B3/10, A61B5/12 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
A61B5/4023 (EP,US);
A61B5/0051 (EP,US);
A61B5/38 (EP,US);
A61B5/6814 (EP,US);
H04R2460/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ABGABE VON KNOCHENLEITUNGSREIZEN UND ZUR MESSUNG DER GRAVITATIONSREZEPTORFUNKTIONEN DES INNENOHRES | [2020/20] | English: | SYSTEMS FOR DELIVERING BONE CONDUCTION STIMULI TO AND FOR MEASURING GRAVITATION RECEPTOR FUNCTIONS OF THE INNER EAR | [2020/20] | French: | SYSTÈMES POUR APPLIQUER DES STIMULI PAR CONDUCTION OSSEUSE ET POUR MESURER LES FONCTIONS DES RÉCEPTEURS GRAVITATIONNELS DE L'OREILLE INTERNE | [2020/20] |
Former [2016/12] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABGABE VON KNOCHENLEITUNGSREIZEN UND ZUR MESSUNG DER GRAVITATIONSREZEPTORFUNKTIONEN DES INNENOHRES | ||
Former [2016/12] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DELIVERING BONE CONDUCTION STIMULI TO AND FOR MEASURING GRAVITATION RECEPTOR FUNCTIONS OF THE INNER EAR | ||
Former [2016/12] | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR APPLIQUER DES STIMULI PAR CONDUCTION OSSEUSE ET POUR MESURER LES FONCTIONS DES RÉCEPTEURS GRAVITATIONNELS DE L'OREILLE INTERNE | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 22.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/13] | 10.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2009112247 (FREEMAN DOMINIQUE [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0107] , [0115] , [0118]; figures 1,5-18 * [A] 4,12-15 [I] 2,3,5-11; | [XAI]US8394117 (HEIN HEINZ-MICHAEL [CH], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1-9 * [A] 4,12-15 [I] 2,3,5-11; | [A]US2009065226 (JOHN ALEXANDER [AT], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0075]; figure 1 * | International search | [A]WO9909881 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]); | [A]US2004199214 (MERFELD DANIEL M [US], et al); | [A]US2008275513 (LATTNER STEFANIE [US], et al); | [A]US2009292161 (PARKER JOHN L [AU]); | [A]WO2011163115 (VIBRANT MED EL HEARING TECH [US], et al) |