EP2968988 - METHODS FOR EVALUATING COPD STATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Veracyte, Inc. 6000 Shoreline Court, Suite 300 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2018/08] |
Former [2017/48] | For all designated states Veracyte, Inc. 7000 Shoreline Court Suite 250 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | ||
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states Allegro Diagnostics Corp. Clock Tower Place Building 6 Suite 225 Maynard, MA 01754 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITNEY, Duncan, H. 54 Bret Harte Ter No.: 1 San Francisco, CA 94133-1604 / US | 02 /
LUO, Jun 253 Waverley Street 2 Belmont, MA 02478 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 14797859.7 | 13.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US25715 | Priority number, date | US201361783983P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361783983 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014186036 | Date: | 20.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2968988 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61P11/00, C12Q1/68, G01N33/53 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
G16B25/00 (EP,US);
G16B25/10 (EP,US);
G16B40/00 (EP,US);
G16B40/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEWERTUNG EINES COPD-STATUS | [2016/03] | English: | METHODS FOR EVALUATING COPD STATUS | [2016/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'ÉVALUATION DE L'ÉTAT D'UNE MALADIE PULMONAIRE OBSTRUCTIVE CHRONIQUE (COPD) | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 06.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/03] | 06.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/03] | Divisional application(s) | EP19190846.6 / EP3626308 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.12.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.09.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 26.09.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 06.09.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 06.09.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.09.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 06.09.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 06.09.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.09.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2006105252 (UNIV COLORADO [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [XY]US2010119474 (CRYSTAL RONALD G [US], et al) [X] 1-4,11,15 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0056]; figure 16a * * paragraph [0291] - paragraph [0295] * [Y] 5-10,12-14; | [Y]WO2012129237 (UNIV BOSTON [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [XY] - KATRINA STEILING ET AL, "A Dynamic Bronchial Airway Gene Expression Signature of Chronic Obstructive Pulmonary Disease and Lung Function Impairment", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF RESPIRATORY AND CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE, (20130307), vol. 187, no. 9, doi:10.1164/rccm.201208-1449OC, ISSN 1073-449X, pages 933 - 942, XP055210591 [X] 1,11 * the whole document * [Y] 2-10,12-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1164/rccm.201208-1449OC | [Y] - SOUMYAROOP BHATTACHARYA1 ET AL, "Molecular biomarkers for quantitative and discrete COPD phenotypes", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF RESPIRATORY CELL AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, AMERICAN LUNG ASSOCIATION, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20081010), vol. 40, no. 3, doi:10.1165/RCMB.2008-0114OC, ISSN 1044-1549, pages 359 - 367, XP008165045 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1165/rcmb.2008-0114OC | [Y] - SANTIYAGU M. SAVARIMUTHU FRANCIS ET AL, "Genes and Gene Ontologies Common to Airflow Obstruction and Emphysema in the Lungs of Patients with COPD", PLOS ONE, (20110315), vol. 6, no. 3, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0017442, page e17442, XP055005171 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0017442 | [Y] - JOSHUA D CAMPBELL ET AL, "A gene expression signature of emphysema-related lung destruction and its reversal by the tripeptide GHK", GENOME MED, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, LONDON, UK, (20120831), vol. 4, no. 8, doi:10.1186/GM367, ISSN 1756-994X, page 67, XP021140588 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/gm367 | [Y] - MARIANI THOMAS J ET AL, "Molecular markers for quantitative and discrete COPD phenotypes", THE FASEB JOURNAL, FEDERATION OF AMERICAN SOCIETIES FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY, US, (20070401), vol. 21, no. 5, ISSN 0892-6638, page A8, XP009191940 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - ZESKIND JULIE E ET AL, "Translating the COPD transcriptome: insights into pathogenesis and tools for clinical management.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN THORACIC SOCIETY 1 DEC 2008, (20081201), vol. 5, no. 8, ISSN 1546-3222, pages 834 - 841, XP002762652 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1513/pats.200807-074TH | International search | [Y]US2006019272 (GERACI MARK W [US], et al); | [Y]US2006241869 (SCHADT ERIC E [US], et al); | [X]US2010119474 (CRYSTAL RONALD G [US], et al); | [Y]US2010255486 (SHOWE MICHAEL [US], et al); | [Y]US2012264626 (NANA-SINKAM SERGE PATRICK [US], et al); | [Y]WO2013190092 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH], et al) |