EP2996554 - SYSTEM FOR DECREMENT EVOKED POTENTIAL (DEEP) MAPPING TO IDENTIFY CRITICAL COMPONENTS OF THE ARRYTHMOGENIC CIRCUIT IN CARDIAC ARRHYTHMIAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/12] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DECREMENT EVOKED POTENTIAL (DEEP) MAPPING TO IDENTIFY CRITICAL COMPONENTS OF THE ARRYTHMOGENIC CIRCUIT IN CARDIAC ARRHYTHMIAS | ||
[2023/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University Health Network 190 Elizabeth Street R. Fraser Elliott Building - Room 1S-417 Toronto, Ontario M5G 2C4 / CA | [2016/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NANTHAKUMAR, Kumaraswamy c/o Toronto General Hospital 200 Elizabeth St. Gerrard Wing 3-526 Toronto, Ontario M5G 2C4 / CA | 02 /
DOWNAR, Eugene 327 Sumach St. Toronto, Ontario M5A 3K6 / CA | 03 /
MASSE, Stephane 122 Quebec Avenue Toronto, Ontario M6P 2T6 / CA | [2016/12] | Representative(s) | Papa, Elisabetta, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A Piazza di Pietra, 39 00186 Roma / IT | [2016/12] | Application number, filing date | 14798103.9 | 16.05.2014 | [2016/12] | WO2014CA00438 | Priority number, date | US201361824457P | 17.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361824457 P | [2016/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014183206 | Date: | 20.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2996554 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2996554 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 20.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B34/10, A61B5/283, A61B5/287, A61B5/363, A61B5/366 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
A61B5/283 (EP,US);
A61B34/10 (US);
A61B5/287 (EP,US);
A61B5/363 (EP,US);
A61B5/366 (EP,US);
A61B5/6852 (EP,US);
A61B2034/105 (US);
A61B2505/05 (EP,US);
A61B5/349 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/07] | A61B5/0472, A61B5/042, A61B5/0432, A61B5/0452, A61B5/00, A61B34/10, A61B5/0464 | ||
Former IPC [2016/12] | A61B5/0472, A61B5/042, A61B5/0432, A61B5/0452 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR DECREMENT EVOKED POTENTIAL (DEEP)-ABBILDUNG ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG KRITISCHER KOMPONENTEN DES ARRYTHMOGENEN KREISLAUFS IN HERZRHYTHMUSSTÖRUNGEN | [2023/16] | English: | SYSTEM FOR DECREMENT EVOKED POTENTIAL (DEEP) MAPPING TO IDENTIFY CRITICAL COMPONENTS OF THE ARRYTHMOGENIC CIRCUIT IN CARDIAC ARRHYTHMIAS | [2023/16] | French: | SYSTEME POUR UNE CARTOGRAPHIE DE DIMINUTION DE POTENTIEL EVOQUE (DEEP) POUR IDENTIFIER DES COMPOSANTS CRITIQUES DU CIRCUIT ARYTHMOGENE DANS DES ARYTHMIES CARDIAQUES | [2023/16] |
Former [2016/12] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR DECREMENT EVOKED POTENTIAL (DEEP)-ABBILDUNG ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG KRITISCHER KOMPONENTEN DES ARRYTHMOGENEN KREISLAUFS IN HERZRHYTHMUSSTÖRUNGEN | ||
Former [2016/12] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DECREMENT EVOKED POTENTIAL (DEEP) MAPPING TO IDENTIFY CRITICAL COMPONENTS OF THE ARRYTHMOGENIC CIRCUIT IN CARDIAC ARRHYTHMIAS | ||
Former [2016/12] | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR UNE CARTOGRAPHIE DE DIMINUTION DE POTENTIEL EVOQUE (DEEP) POUR IDENTIFIER DES COMPOSANTS CRITIQUES DU CIRCUIT ARYTHMOGENE DANS DES ARYTHMIES CARDIAQUES | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 10.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9415528 (GOLDREYER BRUCE N [US]) [X] 1,3-6,8-13,15 * page 10, line 17 - line 29 * * page 11, line 33 * * page 12, lines 7, 16, 17, 20, 21, 31, 32, 36 * * page 13, lines 17-21 * * page 14, lines 20,36 * * page 15, lines 31, 32 * * figures 2, 3, 5, 6, 9 * [I] 2,7,14; | [A]US2003023130 (CIACCIO EDWARD J [US], et al) [A] 14 * paragraph [0074] *; | [A]WO2005006946 (NEW YORK UNIVERISTY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008063498 (WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY OF ST LO [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A] - T. KAWARA ET AL, "Activation Delay After Premature Stimulation in Chronically Diseased Human Myocardium Relates to the Architecture of Interstitial Fibrosis", CIRCULATION, US, (20011218), vol. 104, no. 25, doi:10.1161/hc5001.100833, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 3069 - 3075, XP055332321 [A] 2 * figures 1, 6B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/hc5001.100833 | [A] - P.D. LAMBIASE ET AL, "High-Density Substrate Mapping in Brugada Syndrome: Combined Role of Conduction and Repolarization Heterogeneities in Arrhythmogenesis", CIRCULATION, US, (20090629), vol. 120, no. 2, doi:10.1161/CIRCULATIONAHA.108.771401, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 106 - 117, XP055332382 [A] 7 * figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/CIRCULATIONAHA.108.771401 | [A] - R C Saumarez, "The Significance of Paced Electrogram Fractionation in Hypertrophic Cardiomyopathy | Circulation", Circulation, (19950601), pages 2762 - 2768, URL: http://circ.ahajournals.org/content/91/11/2762.full, (20170105), XP055332401 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - WILLIAM G STEVENSON, "Fractionated Endocardial Electrograms Are Associated With Slow Conduction in Humans", JACC, (19890101), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 369 - 376, XP055332313 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US7966067 (ROUSSO BENNY [IL], et al); | [A]US8239019 (DOERR THOMAS [DE], et al); | [A] - MASSÉ ET AL., "A Data Acquisition System for Real-Time Activation Detection of Cardiac Electrograms II: Software", ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY, (19911031), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 782 - 783, XP000348302 |