EP2955820 - PRODUCTION METHOD FOR STATOR FOR ROTATING ELECTRICAL MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi 444-1192 / JP | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2016/41] |
Former [2015/51] | For all designated states Aisin Aw Co., Ltd. 10 Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi, Aichi 444-1192 / JP | ||
For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHIMOTO Shingo c/o AISIN AW CO. LTD. 10 Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | 02 /
YOKOYAMA Takeshi c/o AISIN AW CO. LTD. 10 Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA Hiroyuki c/o AISIN AW CO. LTD. 10 Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | 04 /
IWATSUKI Kazuya c/o AISIN AW CO. LTD. 10 Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | 05 /
HASHIMOTO Takahiro c/o AISIN AW CO. LTD. 10 Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | 06 /
MIYATA Hisao c/o AISIN AW CO. LTD. 10 Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | 07 /
YOSHIKAWA Kirika c/o AISIN AW CO. LTD. 10 Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | 08 /
OTA Takanori c/o AISIN AW CO. LTD. 10 Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | 09 /
KAWAURA Hirotaka c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 10 /
AKAO Norihiko c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 11 /
SUGIMOTO Tetsuya c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 12 /
NAKAGAMI Yukihiko c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2015/51] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2015/51] | Application number, filing date | 14798213.6 | 12.05.2014 | [2015/51] | WO2014JP62583 | Priority number, date | JP20130105347 | 17.05.2013 Original published format: JP 2013105347 | [2015/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014185376 | Date: | 20.11.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2955820 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2955820 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2955820 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/06, H02K1/16, H02K15/085 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
H02K15/062 (EP,US);
H02K15/085 (US);
H02K15/0056 (US);
H02K15/024 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR STATOR FÜR ELEKTRISCHE DREHMASCHINEN | [2015/51] | English: | PRODUCTION METHOD FOR STATOR FOR ROTATING ELECTRICAL MACHINES | [2015/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE STATOR POUR MACHINES ÉLECTRIQUES ROTATIVES | [2015/51] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2015 | Translation filed | 10.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/51] | 23.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.05.2014 | AL | 12.10.2016 | AT | 12.10.2016 | BE | 12.10.2016 | CY | 12.10.2016 | CZ | 12.10.2016 | DK | 12.10.2016 | EE | 12.10.2016 | ES | 12.10.2016 | FI | 12.10.2016 | HR | 12.10.2016 | IT | 12.10.2016 | LT | 12.10.2016 | LV | 12.10.2016 | MC | 12.10.2016 | MK | 12.10.2016 | NL | 12.10.2016 | PL | 12.10.2016 | RO | 12.10.2016 | RS | 12.10.2016 | SE | 12.10.2016 | SI | 12.10.2016 | SK | 12.10.2016 | SM | 12.10.2016 | TR | 12.10.2016 | BG | 12.01.2017 | NO | 12.01.2017 | GR | 13.01.2017 | IS | 12.02.2017 | PT | 13.02.2017 | IE | 12.05.2017 | LU | 12.05.2017 | MT | 12.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 12.05.2014 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
TR | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
IE | 12.05.2017 | ||
LU | 12.05.2017 | ||
MT | 12.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 12.05.2014 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
IE | 12.05.2017 | ||
LU | 12.05.2017 | ||
MT | 12.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 12.05.2014 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
IE | 12.05.2017 | ||
LU | 12.05.2017 | ||
MT | 12.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 12.05.2014 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
IE | 12.05.2017 | ||
LU | 12.05.2017 | ||
MT | 12.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
IE | 12.05.2017 | ||
LU | 12.05.2017 | ||
MT | 12.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
IE | 12.05.2017 | ||
LU | 12.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 12.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 12.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012112594 (SANO SHINYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2012256511 (HARUNO KENTARO [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]JP2012223056 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1* figures 6-7 * | International search | [A]JP2006166610 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2007512797 (TM4 INC.); | [A]JP2007221913 (SAWAFUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JP2008220093 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2012257410 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2012257409 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) | by applicant | JP2012257410 |