EP3069066 - FLUID TRANSMISSION FLAT-FACE COUPLER WITH FRONTAL ANNULAR SEAL. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stucchi S.p.A. Via Galileo Galilei, 1 24053 Brignano Gera d'Adda (BG) / IT | [2016/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GATTI, Gianmarco Viale Piave 1/C I-24040 Pognano (BG) / IT | 02 /
STUCCHI, Giovanni Via Mons. Bignamini 4 I-24047 Treviglio (BG) / IT | 03 /
TIVELLI, Sergio Via San Martino 13 I-24050 Cividate Al Piano (BG) / IT | [2016/38] | Representative(s) | Mittler, Andrea, et al MITTLER & C. s.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | [2016/38] | Application number, filing date | 14798775.4 | 10.11.2014 | [2016/38] | WO2014EP74120 | Priority number, date | IT2013MI01866 | 11.11.2013 Original published format: IT MI20131866 | [2016/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015067794 | Date: | 14.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3069066 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3069066 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/56, F16L37/23, F16L37/32, F16L37/413 | [2018/02] | CPC: |
F16L37/32 (EP,KR,US);
F16L37/23 (EP,KR,US);
F16L37/413 (EP,KR,US);
F16L37/56 (EP,KR,US);
F16L2201/80 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/38] | F16L37/23, F16L37/32, F16L37/413 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/38] | Extension states | BA | 07.06.2016 | ME | 07.06.2016 | Title | German: | FLACHSEITENKOPPLER MIT STIRNSEITIGER RINGDICHTUNG FÜR STRÖMUNGSGETRIEBE | [2016/38] | English: | FLUID TRANSMISSION FLAT-FACE COUPLER WITH FRONTAL ANNULAR SEAL. | [2016/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ACCOUPLEMENT À FACE PLATE POUR LA TRANSMISSION DE FLUIDE À JOINT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ ANNULAIRE FRONTAL | [2016/38] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/38] | 20.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0122404 (WALTHER CARL KURT GMBH [DE]) [A] 4* page 4 - page 11; figures 1,4 *; | [YD]US4540021 (ROGERS RUSSELL L [US]) [YD] 1-4,6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004079423 (MIKIYA TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [XY]DE10230293 (DART ENGINEERING AG ZUG [CH]) [X] 5 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0082]; figure - * [Y] 6; | [XY]US2006273580 (MARQUIS TIMOTHY T [US]) [X] 5 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0038]; figure - * [Y] 1-4,6; | [Y]EP2407701 (FASTER SPA [IT]) [Y] 6 * abstract * | by applicant | US3407847 | US4540021 | ITMI20121254 |