Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10327999 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2019 | B2 | US2016287490 | 06.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP74303 | 12.11.2014 | DE102013226807 | 20.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3082745 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2019 | B1 | EP3082745 | 26.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP74303 | 12.11.2014 | DE102013226807 | 20.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015090738 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102013226807 | 20.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102013226807 | 25.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102013226807 | 20.12.2013 |