EP3063157 - METAL COMPLEXES CONTAINING AMIDOIMINE LIGANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAFC HITECH, INC. 1429 Hilldale Avenue Haverhill, MA 01832-1300 / US | [2019/25] |
Former [2016/36] | For all designated states SAFC Hitech 1429 Hilldale Avenue Haverhill, MA 01832-1300 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANJOLIA, Ravi 150 Old Farm Road North Andover, Massachusetts 01845 / US | 02 /
GARRATT, Shaun 35 Corniche Road Wirral Merseyside CH62 5HA / GB | 03 /
THOMPSON, David c/o Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 04 /
ANTHIS, Jeffrey c/o Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2018/40] |
Former [2016/36] | 01 /
KANJOLIA, Ravi 150 Old Farm Road North Andover, Massachusetts 01845 / US | ||
02 /
GARRATT, Shaun 35 Corniche Road Wirral Merseyside CH62 5HA / GB | |||
03 /
THOMPSON, David 2193 Bentley Ridge Road San Jose, California 95138 / US | |||
04 /
ANTHIS, Jeffrey 1008 Empey Way San Jose, California 95128 / US | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/40] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2016/36] | Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 14799261.4 | 24.10.2014 | [2016/36] | WO2014US62108 | Priority number, date | US201361896218P | 28.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361896218 P | [2016/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015065823 | Date: | 07.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3063157 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3063157 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3063157 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07F13/00, C07C251/08, C23C16/18 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
C07F13/005 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/45553 (KR,US);
C07C251/08 (EP,US);
C23C16/18 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/34 (US);
C23C16/40 (KR,US);
C23C16/45527 (KR);
C23C16/45534 (KR);
C23C16/45536 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METALLKOMPLEXE MIT AMIDOIMIN-LIGANDEN | [2016/36] | English: | METAL COMPLEXES CONTAINING AMIDOIMINE LIGANDS | [2016/36] | French: | COMPLEXES MÉTALLIQUES CONTENANT DES LIGANDS AMIDOIMINE | [2016/36] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 21.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2018 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | 24.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.10.2014 | AL | 03.10.2018 | AT | 03.10.2018 | CY | 03.10.2018 | CZ | 03.10.2018 | DK | 03.10.2018 | EE | 03.10.2018 | ES | 03.10.2018 | FI | 03.10.2018 | HR | 03.10.2018 | IT | 03.10.2018 | LT | 03.10.2018 | LV | 03.10.2018 | MC | 03.10.2018 | MK | 03.10.2018 | NL | 03.10.2018 | PL | 03.10.2018 | RO | 03.10.2018 | RS | 03.10.2018 | SE | 03.10.2018 | SI | 03.10.2018 | SK | 03.10.2018 | SM | 03.10.2018 | TR | 03.10.2018 | LU | 24.10.2018 | MT | 24.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | FR | 03.12.2018 | BG | 03.01.2019 | GB | 03.01.2019 | NO | 03.01.2019 | GR | 04.01.2019 | IS | 03.02.2019 | PT | 03.02.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
MT | 24.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 03.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GB | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
MT | 24.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 03.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GB | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 03.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GB | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 03.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 03.10.2018 | |
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 03.10.2018 | |
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 03.10.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO9830609 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,26-29,31,32 * compounds (VII),2, (XV), (XVI), (XVII) * * abstract * [Y] 13,16,19 [I] 5,30; | [XAYI]US2013251903
(HAN WON SEOK [KR]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-12,14,31,32 * | [XY] - ROSENBERGER ET AL, "Diazadien-Komplexe des Rutheniums. XIII. Bis(diazadien)ruthenium: Isomerisierung, Hydrierung, Metallierung; Struktur eines Kalium(tmeda)2-ruthenats(0)", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (19910101), vol. 411, no. 3, doi:10.1016/0022-328X(91)83049-A, ISSN 0022-328X, pages 445 - 456, XP002410474 [X] 1,3,4,6,7,15,17,18,20,31,32 * compound 4 * * scheme 2 * [Y] 16,19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-328X(91)83049-A | [X] - ANNA EISSLER ET AL, "[alpha]-Dialdimine Complexes of Rhodium(I) and Iridium(I): Their Reactivity with Dioxygen and Dihydrogen", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (20130910), vol. 2013, no. 27, doi:10.1002/ejic.201300625, ISSN 1434-1948, pages 4775 - 4788, XP055160421 [X] 1,3,4,6 * compound G * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ejic.201300625 | [X] - PETER B KRAIKIVSKII ET AL, "Formation of the paramagletic Ni(I) -allyl complex in the Ni(allyl)(2,6-diisopropylphenyl)diazabutadiene system", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 696, no. 22, doi:10.1016/J.JORGANCHEM.2011.07.023, ISSN 0022-328X, (20110718), pages 3483 - 3490, (20110726), XP028295566 [X] 1-4,6-8 * scheme 2 compound a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jorganchem.2011.07.023 | by applicant | US4581249 | - Chemical Vapour Deposition: Precursors, Processes, and Applications, THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, (2009), pages 1 - 36 | - INORG. CHEM., (2009), vol. 48, pages 7639 - 7644 | - GEORGE S. M. ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM., (1996), vol. 100, pages 13121 - 13131 | - POTTER R. J. ET AL., CHEM. VAP. DEPOSITION, (2005), vol. 11, no. 3, pages 159 - 169 |