EP3071269 - DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE WITH DOSE DELIVERY CLICKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstraße 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2016/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLANCKE, Stefan c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
TEUCHER, Axel c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 03 /
JUGL, Michael c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 04 /
SCHNEIDER, Christiane c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2016/39] | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 14799437.0 | 17.11.2014 | [2016/39] | WO2014EP74709 | Priority number, date | US201361907470P | 22.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361907470 P | EP20140165752 | 24.04.2014 Original published format: EP 14165752 | [2016/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015074983 | Date: | 28.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3071269 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315, A61M5/24 | [2016/39] | CPC: |
A61M5/31551 (EP,CN,US);
A61M5/3157 (EP,CN,US);
A61M5/31575 (EP,CN,US);
A61M5/31578 (US);
A61M5/3158 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2005/3104 (US);
A61M2205/581 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/582 (EP,CN,US);
A61M5/24 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/39] | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTELABGABEVORRICHTUNG MIT DOSISABGABEKLICKER | [2016/39] | English: | DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE WITH DOSE DELIVERY CLICKER | [2016/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT COMPRENANT UN ÉLÉMENT D'ENCLIQUETAGE D'ADMINISTRATION DE DOSE | [2016/39] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/39] | 13.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US5328476 (BIDWELL JAMES K [US]) [I] 1-7,12 * column 3, lines 20-25 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 3 * * column 4, lines 13-18 * * figures 1-9 *; | [I]WO03080160 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [I] 1-6,12 * page 10, lines 9-32 * * page 14, lines 15-19 * * figures 1-3 *; | [I]WO2008016381 (ALGEN & KLEMER LLC [US], et al) [I] 1-7,9 * page 48, lines 13-21 * * page 49, lines 14-15 * * page 52, line 4 - page 53, line 2 * * figures 33-37 *; | [I]WO2011003979 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [I] 1,7-12 * page 21, lines 3-24; figures 7-10b,18a-19b *; | [I]US2011046565 (RADMER BO [DK], et al) [I] 1-8* paragraphs [0152] , [0168]; figures 8-10b *; | [I]EP2468335 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [I] 1-6,12 * paragraphs [0025] , [0036] , [0047]; figures 2A-4 * | Examination | US2007265579 | by applicant | WO2005018721 |