Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9839596 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2017 | B2 | US2016296452 | 13.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP74968 | 19.11.2014 | DE102013226587 | 19.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105828881B | Global Dossier | 30.04.2019 | B | CN105828881 | 03.08.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP74968 | 19.11.2014 | DE102013226587 | 19.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3082962 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2019 | B1 | EP3082962 | 26.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP74968 | 19.11.2014 | DE102013226587 | 19.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015090812 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102013226587 | 19.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102013226587 | 25.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102013226587 | 19.12.2013 |