EP3080029 - LIFT ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/42] | ELEVATOR SYSTEM | ||
[2017/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [2016/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORTONA, Elena Kurfirstenstrasse 26 CH-8002 Zürich / CH | 02 /
SCHMID, Frankie Eschenweg 14 CH-6030 Ebikon / CH | [2016/42] | Application number, filing date | 14800003.7 | 13.11.2014 | [2016/42] | WO2014EP74465 | Priority number, date | EP20130196230 | 09.12.2013 Original published format: EP 13196230 | [2016/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015086251 | Date: | 18.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3080029 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3080029 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B66B11/02 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
B66B11/022 (EP,US);
B66B9/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFZUGANLAGE | [2016/42] | English: | LIFT ASSEMBLY | [2017/31] | French: | INSTALLATION D'ASCENSEUR | [2016/42] |
Former [2016/42] | ELEVATOR SYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/42] | 17.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2014 | AL | 31.01.2018 | CY | 31.01.2018 | DK | 31.01.2018 | EE | 31.01.2018 | FI | 31.01.2018 | HR | 31.01.2018 | IT | 31.01.2018 | LT | 31.01.2018 | LV | 31.01.2018 | MC | 31.01.2018 | MK | 31.01.2018 | MT | 31.01.2018 | PT | 31.01.2018 | RO | 31.01.2018 | RS | 31.01.2018 | SE | 31.01.2018 | SI | 31.01.2018 | SK | 31.01.2018 | SM | 31.01.2018 | BG | 30.04.2018 | NO | 30.04.2018 | GR | 01.05.2018 | IS | 31.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
PT | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
PT | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2444352 (INVENTIO AG [CH]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]JP2002302364 (FUJITEC KK) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [AD]JP2007331871 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [AD] 1-14 * abstract * |