EP3083470 - ELEVATOR SYSTEM WITH AN ABSOLUTE POSITIONING SYSTEM FOR A DOUBLE-DECKER CAB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Rudolf J. Spitalweg 6 CH-6004 Luzern / CH | 02 /
BIRRER, Eric Altwegrain 7 CH-6033 Buchrain / CH | [2016/43] | Application number, filing date | 14800005.2 | 13.11.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014EP74474 | Priority number, date | EP20130198209 | 18.12.2013 Original published format: EP 13198209 | [2016/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015090747 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3083470 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B66B1/34, B66B11/02 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
B66B1/40 (EP);
B66B11/022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Title | German: | AUFZUGSANLAGE MIT EINEM ABSOLUTPOSITIONIERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINE DOPPELDECKERKABINE | [2016/43] | English: | ELEVATOR SYSTEM WITH AN ABSOLUTE POSITIONING SYSTEM FOR A DOUBLE-DECKER CAB | [2016/43] | French: | INSTALLATION D'ASCENSEUR POURVUE D'UN SYSTÈME DE POSITIONNEMENT ABSOLU POUR UNE DOUBLE CABINE | [2016/43] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 20.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2005167207 (FUJITA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] *; | [Y]EP2657171 (CEDES AG [CH]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] , [0009] , [0010] * |