EP2862127 - MEDICINAL SUBSTANCE IDENTIFICATION BASED ON CONTAINER RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Codonics, Inc. 17991 Englewood Drive Middleburg Heights, OH 44130 / US | [2015/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEEFE, Gary 7567 Deer Path Brecksville, OH 44141 / US | 02 /
SRNKA, Lawrence 6949 Schoepf Drive Northfield Center, OH 44067 / US | 03 /
BOTTEN, Peter 870 Beach Road Lakewood, OH 44107 / US | [2015/17] | Representative(s) | Conti, Marco Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [2015/17] | Application number, filing date | 14801034.1 | 19.05.2014 | WO2014US38594 | Priority number, date | US201361825011P | 18.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361825011 P | [2015/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014189834 | Date: | 27.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2862127 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 27.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, G06K9/20, A61J1/00 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
G16H30/20 (EP,US);
G06F16/5866 (EP,US);
G06V30/2247 (US);
G16H20/13 (EP,US);
G16H30/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/17] | G06K9/20, G06F19/00, A61J1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] | Title | German: | ARZNEISTOFFIDENTIFIZIERUNG AUF DER BASIS VON BEHÄLTERERKENNUNG | [2015/17] | English: | MEDICINAL SUBSTANCE IDENTIFICATION BASED ON CONTAINER RECOGNITION | [2015/17] | French: | IDENTIFICATION DE SUBSTANCE MÉDICINALE BASÉE SUR LA RECONNAISSANCE D'UN CONTENANT | [2015/17] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 08.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/12] | 14.10.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.10.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2019 | 31.05.2021 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2021 | 31.05.2022 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2005279419 (TRIBBLE DENNIS [US], et al) [I] 1,9 * paragraphs [0079] - [0080] * [Y] 2-8,10-15; | [Y]US2011093279 (LEVINE WILTON C [US], et al) [Y] 2-8,10-15* paragraphs [0082] - [0095] * | International search | [A]US2008314978 (FEDORKO LUDWIK [CA], et al); | [A]US7559483 (HICKLE RANDALL S [US], et al); | [X]WO2011046725 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al); | [A]US2012201434 (NATALI LUCA [IT], et al) |