EP2905944 - WEBPAGE REAL-TIME COMMUNICATION METHOD AND SYSTEM, AND TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Device (Dongguan) Co., Ltd. B2-5 of Nanfang Factory No.2 of Xincheng Road Songshan Lake Science and Technology Industrial Zone Dongguan, Guangdong 523808 / CN | [2017/45] |
Former [2015/33] | For all designated states Huawei Device Co., Ltd. Building B2 Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yahui Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
GAO, Wenmei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
FAN, Shunan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
LV, Xiaoqiang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
JING, Hao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2015/33] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/33] | Lord, Michael Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 14801045.7 | 22.04.2014 | [2015/33] | WO2014CN75902 | Priority number, date | CN20131189867 | 21.05.2013 Original published format: CN201310189867 | [2015/33] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014187214 | Date: | 27.11.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2905944 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/12 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04L65/1069 (US);
H04L51/046 (US);
H04L61/2575 (EP,US);
H04L61/2589 (EP,US);
H04L65/401 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/33] | H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] | Title | German: | ECHTZEITKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR WEBSEITEN SOWIE ENDGERÄT | [2015/33] | English: | WEBPAGE REAL-TIME COMMUNICATION METHOD AND SYSTEM, AND TERMINAL | [2015/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION EN TEMPS RÉEL DE PAGE WEB ET TERMINAL | [2015/33] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2015 | Translation filed | 07.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 07.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 21.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/32] | 04.07.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.09.2018 | 24.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009086681 (CHATURVEDI SIVAKUMAR R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,11-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0023] , [0024] , [0028] , [0034] , [0039] * [I] 4,5,9,10,14,15; | [XI] - WING P PATIL T REDDY P MARTINSEN CISCO D, "Mobility with ICE (MICE); draft-wing-mmusic-ice-mobility-03.txt", MOBILITY WITH ICE (MICE); DRAFT-WING-MMUSIC-ICE-MOBILITY-03.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20130117), pages 1 - 17, XP015089551 [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9,11,12,14 * paragraph [0005] * [I] 3,5,8,10,13,15 | [A] - DAPENG LIU CHINA MOBILE, "Wi-Fi fast recovery analysis; draft-liu-wifi-fast-recovery-00.txt", WI-FI FAST RECOVERY ANALYSIS; DRAFT-LIU-WIFI-FAST-RECOVERY-00.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20121015), pages 1 - 7, XP015087896 [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] * | [A] - REDDY CISCO J KAIPPALLIMALIL HUAWEI RAM MOHAN RAVINDRANATH CISCO R EJZAK ALCATEL-LUCENT T, "Considerations with WebRTC in Mobile Networks; draft-reddy-rtcweb-mobile-02.txt", CONSIDERATIONS WITH WEBRTC IN MOBILE NETWORKS; DRAFT-REDDY-RTCWEB-MOBILE-02.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20130225), pages 1 - 17, XP015092192 [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [05.1] , [05.2] , [05.3] * | International search | [X]CN1501726 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]CN1507176 (TRANGO SYSTEM INC [US]); | [X]CN102131152 (ZTE CORP) |