EP2999515 - DEEP BRAIN STIMULATOR AND METHOD OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deep Brain Innovations LLC 22901 Millcreek Boulevard Cleveland, Ohio 44122 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/13] | For all designated states Deep Brain Innovations LLC 22901 Millcreek Boulevard ClevelandOhio 44122 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STROTHER, Robert 37895 Rogers Road Willoughby Hills, Ohio 44094 / US | 02 /
RUBIN, Stuart 3937 West Ash Lane Orange Village, Ohio 44122 / US | 03 /
SAKAI, Jonathan 19477 Henry Road Fairview Park, Ohio44126 / US | [2016/13] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2016/13] | Application number, filing date | 14801314.7 | 22.05.2014 | [2016/13] | WO2014US39168 | Priority number, date | US201361826361P | 22.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361826361 P | US201361826388P | 22.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361826388 P | US201361826384P | 22.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361826384 P | [2016/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014190167 | Date: | 27.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2999515 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/378 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
A61N1/36178 (EP,US);
A61N1/36067 (EP,US);
A61N1/36082 (EP,US);
A61N1/37235 (EP,US);
A61N1/37518 (EP,US);
A61N1/3787 (EP,US);
A61N1/0534 (EP,US);
A61N1/0539 (EP,US);
A61N1/37247 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] | Title | German: | GEHIRNTIEFENSTIMULATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2016/13] | English: | DEEP BRAIN STIMULATOR AND METHOD OF USE | [2016/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STIMULATION CÉRÉBRALE PROFONDE ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2016/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/13] | 28.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/20] | 12.04.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.05.2021 | 07.05.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP21166026.1 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005143786 (BOVEJA BIRINDER R [US]) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [XYI]US2011184486 (DE RIDDER DIRK [BE]) [X] 1-4,6,17 * abstract * * paragraph [0104] * [Y] 7-16 [I] 5; | [Y]WO2013055940 (UNIV DUKE [US], et al) [Y] 7-16 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2002177884 (AHN TAE YOUNG [KR], et al); | [X]US2005143786 (BOVEJA BIRINDER R [US]); | [Y]US2009143696 (NAJAFI NADER [US], et al); | [X]US2009221896 (RICKERT JOERN [DE], et al); | [Y]US2012095524 (NELSON TIMOTHY SCOTT [AU], et al); | [X]US2012245649 (BOHORI ADNAN KUTUBUDDIN [IN], et al) |