EP3005253 - INVENTORY TRANSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazon Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 8102 Reno, NV 89507 / US | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOPALAKRISHNAN, Varadarajan 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US | 02 /
NARASIMHAN, Subram 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US | 03 /
ZAKARIA, Omar FawazHashim 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US | 04 /
KUMAR, Dilip 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US | 05 /
BOYAPATI, Sridhar 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US | 06 /
KIM, Jin Dong 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 14801359.2 | 26.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014US39474 | Priority number, date | US201313902770 | 24.05.2013 Original published format: US201313902770 | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014190341 | Date: | 27.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3005253 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/08 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | G06Q10/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Title | German: | INVENTARÜBERGÄNGE | [2016/15] | English: | INVENTORY TRANSITIONS | [2016/15] | French: | TRANSITIONS D'INVENTAIRE | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 21.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/11] | 10.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/11] | 23.10.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP19218305.1 / EP3686824 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US2008068170 (EHRMAN KENNETH S [US], et al); | [X]US2008183326 (DANELSKI DARIN L [US]) |