EP2999646 - TRASH BAG SECURING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states O'Brien, Brian Glen Gardner, New Jersey 08826 / US | [2016/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/13] | Representative(s) | Wittmann, Günther Patentanwaltskanzlei Wittmann Frans-Hals-Straße 31 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/13] | Wittmann, Günther Wittmann Hernandez Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Frans-Hals-Strasse 31 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14801380.8 | 22.05.2014 | [2016/13] | WO2014US39119 | Priority number, date | US201361826363P | 22.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361826363 P | [2016/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014190142 | Date: | 27.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2999646 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B65F1/06 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
B65F1/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/13] | B65F1/06, B65D33/30, B65D33/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM FÜR MÜLLTÜTEN | [2016/13] | English: | TRASH BAG SECURING SYSTEM | [2016/13] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FIXATION DE SAC-POUBELLE | [2016/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/13] | 27.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/33] | 11.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 23.10.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 23.10.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.11.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4338979 (DOW RAY A) [A] 1,2,5-11,16,17 * column 2, line 17 - line 63 * * figures 1-7 *; | [A]US5615853 (HEARST BYIRL J [US]) [A] 1,2,16,17 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 29 ** figures 1-7 *; | [A]US5711563 (SAPP JAMES R [US]) [A] 1,2,16,17 * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 67 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE202010001592U (LOH KG HAILO WERK [DE]) [A] 1,5-11,17 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0025] * * figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]US2598334 (FRANK AHLBURG); | [A]US3927445 (PAVLISH ALLEN T); | [Y]DE7800603U (HERKULES VERPACKUNG [DE]); | [A]US4923087 (BURROWS ROGER A [US]); | [Y]US5732845 (ARMALY JR JOHN W [US]); | [Y]US5765748 (CHEN IN-CHANG [US]); | [Y]US6056147 (JARMAN MURRAY [US]); | [X]JP2002347901 (KASHIWAYA KK); | [Y]US6557716 (CHAN EDMUND [US]) |