EP3006524 - URETHANE COMPOSITION FOR COATING FILM WATERPROOF MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dyflex Corporation 2-4-1 Nishi-Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0825 / JP | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHINO Kenji c/o DYFLEX CORPORATION 2-4-1 Nishi-Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0825 / JP | 02 /
KAI Yoichi c/o DYFLEX CORPORATION 2-4-1 Nishi-Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0825 / JP | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Sika Patent Attorneys C/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Sika Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 Postfach 8048 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 14801396.4 | 23.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014JP63741 | Priority number, date | JP20130110108 | 24.05.2013 Original published format: JP 2013110108 | [2016/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014189140 | Date: | 27.11.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3006524 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C09D175/04, C08G18/10, C09D175/08, C08K5/00, C08G18/32, C08G18/48, C08G18/66, C08G18/75 | [2018/46] | CPC: |
C09D175/08 (EP,US);
C09D175/04 (US);
B05D7/26 (US);
C08G18/3206 (EP,US);
C08G18/324 (EP,US);
C08G18/4812 (EP,US);
C08G18/4825 (EP,US);
C08G18/4829 (EP,US);
C08G18/6674 (EP,US);
C08G18/755 (EP,US);
C08K5/0016 (US);
C09D7/40 (EP,US);
E04D7/00 (US);
B05D2203/30 (US);
B05D2503/00 (US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/6685, C08G18/302 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/09] | C09D175/04, C08G18/10, C09D7/12, C09D175/08, C08K5/00, C08G18/32, C08G18/48, C08G18/66, C08G18/75 | ||
Former IPC [2016/15] | C09D175/04, C08G18/10, C09D7/12, C09D175/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Title | German: | URETHANZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR EIN WASSERDICHTES MATERIAL EINER BESCHICHTUNGSFOLIE | [2016/15] | English: | URETHANE COMPOSITION FOR COATING FILM WATERPROOF MATERIAL | [2016/15] | French: | COMPOSITION D'URÉTHANE POUR MATÉRIAU IMPERMÉABLE DE FILM DE REVÊTEMENT | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2015 | Translation filed | 04.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 02.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 15.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH06298896 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [A]JP2001329042 (NIPPON POLYURETHANE KOGYO KK); | [A]JP2003313538 (I C K KK); | [A]JP2011080018 (DYFLEX CORP) | by applicant | JP3592479B | - Building Construction Standard Specification and explanation JASS8, waterproof construction |