Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
06.07.2019 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
14.05.2019 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
27.11.2018 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
12.10.2018 | Change - classification | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
12.10.2018 | Change - classification | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
05.06.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant | |
02.06.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
31.01.2017 | Supplementary search report | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
27.01.2017 | Change - classification | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
27.01.2017 | Change - classification | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
29.07.2016 | Change - extension states | published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] |
03.06.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.03.2016 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] |
11.03.2016 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] |
18.01.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.01.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.12.2015 | Change - representative | |
18.12.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.12.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.11.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication |