Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10066120 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2018 | B2 | US2016096976 | 07.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013110108 | 24.05.2013 | WO2014JP63741 | 23.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014269389B | Global Dossier | 29.06.2017 | B2 | AU2014269389 | 19.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013110108 | 24.05.2013 | WO2014JP63741 | 23.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3006524 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2017 | A4 | EP3006524 | 13.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013110108 | 24.05.2013 | WO2014JP63741 | 23.05.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014189140 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013110108 | 24.05.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6077932B | Global Dossier | 08.02.2017 | B2 | JP2014227522 | 08.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2013110108 | 24.05.2013 |