EP3077795 - TESTING OF AN INDUSTRIAL STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, Rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | [2016/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAPUIS, Bastien 17 Rue Rieussec 78220 Viroflay / FR | [2020/02] |
Former [2016/41] | 01 /
CHAPUIS, Bastien 17 Rue Rieussec F-78220 Viroflay / FR | Representative(s) | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble Up On 25 Boulevard Romain Rolland CS 40072 75685 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/41] | Hnich-Gasri, Naïma, et al Marks & Clerk France Immeuble Visium 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 14803131.3 | 27.11.2014 | [2016/41] | WO2014EP75763 | Priority number, date | FR20130061916 | 02.12.2013 Original published format: FR 1361916 | [2016/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015082292 | Date: | 11.06.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3077795 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3077795 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01M5/00, G01N29/07, G01N29/24, G01N21/17, G01M11/08, G01N29/06, G01D5/353 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
G01N21/1702 (EP,US);
G01D5/35316 (EP,US);
G01M11/085 (EP,US);
G01M5/0008 (EP,US);
G01M5/0016 (EP,US);
G01M5/0025 (EP,US);
G01M5/0091 (EP,US);
G01N29/0672 (EP,US);
G01N29/07 (EP,US);
G01N29/2418 (EP,US);
G01N2021/1706 (US);
G01N2201/088 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/41] | G01N21/17, G01H9/00, G01M11/08, G01D5/353, G01N29/06, G01L1/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRÜFUNG EINER INDUSTRIESTRUKTUR | [2016/41] | English: | TESTING OF AN INDUSTRIAL STRUCTURE | [2016/41] | French: | CONTROLE DE STRUCTURE INDUSTRIELLE | [2016/41] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/41] | 09.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.11.2014 | AL | 08.01.2020 | AT | 08.01.2020 | CY | 08.01.2020 | CZ | 08.01.2020 | DK | 08.01.2020 | EE | 08.01.2020 | FI | 08.01.2020 | HR | 08.01.2020 | LT | 08.01.2020 | LV | 08.01.2020 | MC | 08.01.2020 | MK | 08.01.2020 | MT | 08.01.2020 | NL | 08.01.2020 | PL | 08.01.2020 | RO | 08.01.2020 | RS | 08.01.2020 | SE | 08.01.2020 | SI | 08.01.2020 | SK | 08.01.2020 | SM | 08.01.2020 | TR | 08.01.2020 | BG | 08.04.2020 | NO | 08.04.2020 | GR | 09.04.2020 | IS | 08.05.2020 | PT | 31.05.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 27.11.2014 | |
AL | 08.01.2020 | ||
AT | 08.01.2020 | ||
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 27.11.2014 | |
AT | 08.01.2020 | ||
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 08.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US6285806 (KERSEY ALAN D [US], et al) [X] 11 * abstract * * column 1, lines 6-18 * * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 35 * [Y] 12,13,15,16 [I] 14; | [Y]US2008156971 (OGISU TOSHIMICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 15,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0052] - [0058] *; | [Y]EP2148216 (ECOLE POLYTECH [CH]) [Y] 2-6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0013] , [0043] , [0050] , [0051] *; | [Y]EP2549247 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN [JP]) [Y] 12,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0008] - [0078] - [0080] - [0089] - [0095] *; | [Y] - DUROUX ADELAIDE ET AL, "Extracting guided waves from cross-correlations of elastic diffuse fields: Applications to remote structural health monitoring", THE JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS FOR THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20100101), vol. 127, no. 1, doi:10.1121/1.3257602, ISSN 0001-4966, pages 204 - 215, XP012135139 [Y] 1-10 * pages 204,205 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1121/1.3257602 | [Y] - KAHANDAWA GAYAN C ET AL, "Use of FBG sensors in SHM of aerospace structures", THIRD ASIA PACIFIC OPTICAL SENSORS CONFERENCE, SPIE, 1000 20TH ST. BELLINGHAM WA 98225-6705 USA, (20120131), vol. 8351, no. 1, doi:10.1117/12.916111, pages 1 - 10, XP060001193 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.916111 | [Y] - Y. BOTSEV ET AL., "Using Fiber Bragg Gratings to Measure Lamb Waves in an Anisotropic Composite Plate", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, 19TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL FIBRE SENSORS, (20080101), vol. 7004, doi:10.1117/12.786055, pages 700445-1 - 700445-4, XP002728264 [Y] 8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.786055 | [A] - TAKEDA N ET AL, "Development of smart composite structures with small-diameter fiber Bragg grating sensors for damage detection: Quantitative evaluation of delamination length in CFRP laminates using Lamb wave sensing", COMPOSITES SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, UK, vol. 65, no. 15-16, ISSN 0266-3538, (20051201), pages 2575 - 2587, (20051201), XP027688113 [A] 1-16 * abstract * |