EP3003641 - ARRANGEMENT, A FASTENING DEVICE, METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CLAMPING A PIECE AS WELL AS A FASTENING CLAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ok-Vise Oy Olli Kytölän tie 6 40950 Muurame / FI | [2021/04] |
Former [2016/15] | For all designated states Ok-Vise Oy Olli Kytölän tie 6 40950 Muurame / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERILÄINEN, Olavi Viitaniementie 25 B 31 FI-40720 Jyväskylä / FI | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Kespat Oy Vasarakatu 1 40320 Jyväskylä / FI | [2021/04] |
Former [2016/15] | Helke, Kimmo Kalervo Kespat Oy Vasarakatu 1 40320 Jyväskylä / FI | Application number, filing date | 14803945.6 | 28.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014FI50428 | Priority number, date | FI20130005604 | 31.05.2013 Original published format: FI 20135604 | [2016/15] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014191629 | Date: | 04.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3003641 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3003641 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B25B1/00, B23Q3/00, B23Q3/02, B23Q3/18, B25B1/02, B25B1/10, B25B1/12, B25B1/24, B23Q3/06, B23Q3/10, B23Q1/44 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
B23Q3/066 (EP,FI,US);
B23Q1/445 (EP,FI,US);
B23Q3/10 (US);
B23Q3/104 (EP,FI,US);
B25B1/02 (EP,FI,US);
B25B1/10 (EP,FI,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | B25B1/00, B23Q3/00, B23Q3/02, B23Q3/18, B25B1/02, B25B1/10, B25B1/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG BEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM SPANNEN EINES WERKSTÜCKES SOWIE BEFESTIGUNGSKLAMMER | [2016/15] | English: | ARRANGEMENT, A FASTENING DEVICE, METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CLAMPING A PIECE AS WELL AS A FASTENING CLAMP | [2016/15] | French: | AGENCEMENT, DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION, PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR SERRER UNE PIECE, AINSI QUE QUE PINCE DE FIXATION | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 12.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.05.2014 | AL | 27.01.2021 | AT | 27.01.2021 | CY | 27.01.2021 | CZ | 27.01.2021 | DK | 27.01.2021 | EE | 27.01.2021 | ES | 27.01.2021 | HR | 27.01.2021 | IT | 27.01.2021 | LT | 27.01.2021 | LV | 27.01.2021 | MC | 27.01.2021 | MK | 27.01.2021 | MT | 27.01.2021 | NL | 27.01.2021 | PL | 27.01.2021 | RO | 27.01.2021 | RS | 27.01.2021 | SE | 27.01.2021 | SI | 27.01.2021 | SK | 27.01.2021 | SM | 27.01.2021 | BG | 27.04.2021 | NO | 27.04.2021 | GR | 28.04.2021 | IS | 27.05.2021 | PT | 27.05.2021 | GB | 28.05.2021 | IE | 28.05.2021 | LU | 28.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | CH | 31.05.2021 | FR | 31.05.2021 | LI | 31.05.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 28.05.2014 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
MK | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
GB | 28.05.2021 | ||
IE | 28.05.2021 | ||
LU | 28.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 28.05.2014 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
GB | 28.05.2021 | ||
IE | 28.05.2021 | ||
LU | 28.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 28.05.2014 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
GB | 28.05.2021 | ||
IE | 28.05.2021 | ||
LU | 28.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
GB | 28.05.2021 | ||
IE | 28.05.2021 | ||
LU | 28.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
GB | 28.05.2021 | ||
IE | 28.05.2021 | ||
LU | 28.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
FR | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
GB | 28.05.2021 | ||
IE | 28.05.2021 | ||
LU | 28.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
IE | 28.05.2021 | ||
LU | 28.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
LU | 28.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
LU | 28.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
LU | 28.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | HR | 27.01.2021 | |
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | HR | 27.01.2021 | |
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | LT | 27.01.2021 | |
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | LT | 27.01.2021 | |
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2992665 (DAVID MERTZ) [A] 1-3,5* column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 50; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP1043124 (GUIDO HOFER MACHINENTECHNIK [CH]) [A] 1-3,5 * abstract * | International search | [Y]GB2130933 (O KYTOLE JA KUMPP KY); | [A]GB2178985 (IZUMI MITSUO); | [A]US5324013 (MARINO MICHAEL L [US]); | [Y]US6659439 (BAUMGARTNER BEAT [CH], et al) | by applicant | US2992665 | GB2130933 | EP1043124 |