EP3006423 - CEMENT ADMIXTURE COMPRISING POLYCARBOXYLIC ACID COPOLYMER, DERIVED FROM A MACROMONOMER, AND LAYERED DOUBLE HYDROXIDE AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/15] | MACROMONOMER FOR PREPARING CEMENT ADMIXTURE AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME, AND CEMENT ADMIXTURE COMPRISING POLYCARBOXYLIC ACID COPOLYMER, DERIVED FROM MACROMONOMER, AND LAYERED DOUBLE HYDROXIDE AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME | ||
[2020/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silkroad C&T Co., LTD Diplomatic Center 9th 2558 Nambusunhwan-ro Seocho-gu Seoul 137-070 / KR | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Bo Seung 109-902 13 Pyeongtaek 5-ro 114beon-gil Pyeongtaek-si Gyeonggi-do 450-765 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Su Il Rm. 501 14 Sillimdong 3-gil Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-892 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Jung Sun 305-1508 91 Dongjak-daero 29-gil Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-773 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Kwang Young 101-1305 15 Tapsil-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-783 / KR | 05 /
CHA, Cheol Yong 136-1802 232 Dongtanbanseok-ro Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-856 / KR | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Böhm, Brigitte Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2020/43] |
Former [2016/15] | Böhm, Brigitte Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14804154.4 | 18.04.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014KR03390 | Priority number, date | KR20130061194 | 29.05.2013 Original published format: KR 20130061194 | KR20130088990 | 26.07.2013 Original published format: KR 20130088990 | [2016/15] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014193082 | Date: | 04.12.2014 | Language: | KO | [2014/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3006423 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3006423 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07C57/03, C07C51/083, C04B24/26, C04B40/00, C04B28/02, // C04B103/40, C04B103/30 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
C04B24/2647 (EP,RU);
C04B28/02 (EP,RU);
C04B40/0039 (EP,RU);
C07C51/083 (EP,RU);
C04B2103/308 (EP);
C04B2103/408 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/02, C04B14/10, C04B24/2647 (EP);
C04B40/0039, C04B14/10, C04B24/2647 (EP);
C07C51/083, C07C57/03 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/08] | C07C57/03, C07C51/083, C04B24/26 | ||
Former IPC [2016/15] | C07C57/03, C07C51/083, C04B24/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZEMENTZUSATZMITTEL MIT EINEM POLYCARBOXYLSÄURE-COPOLYMER AUS EINEM MAKROMONOMER UND SCHICHT-DOPPELHYDROXID SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2020/23] | English: | CEMENT ADMIXTURE COMPRISING POLYCARBOXYLIC ACID COPOLYMER, DERIVED FROM A MACROMONOMER, AND LAYERED DOUBLE HYDROXIDE AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME | [2020/23] | French: | ADJUVANT POUR CIMENT COMPRENANT UN COPOLYMÈRE D'ACIDE POLYCARBOXYLIQUE, DÉRIVÉ D`UN MACROMONOMÈRE, ET HYDROXYDE DOUBLE LAMELLAIRE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2020/23] |
Former [2016/15] | MAKROMONOMER ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ZEMENTBEIMISCHUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG SOWIE ZEMENTBEIMISCHUNG MIT EINEM POLYCARBOXYLSÄURE-COPOLYMER AUS EINEM MAKROMONOMER UND GESCHICHTETES DOPPELHYDROXID SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2016/15] | MACROMONOMER FOR PREPARING CEMENT ADMIXTURE AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME, AND CEMENT ADMIXTURE COMPRISING POLYCARBOXYLIC ACID COPOLYMER, DERIVED FROM MACROMONOMER, AND LAYERED DOUBLE HYDROXIDE AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME | ||
Former [2016/15] | MACROMONOMÈRE POUR PRÉPARER UN ADJUVANT POUR CIMENT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION, ET ADJUVANT POUR CIMENT COMPRENANT UN COPOLYMÈRE D'ACIDE POLYCARBOXYLIQUE, DÉRIVÉ DU MACROMONOMÈRE, ET HYDROXYDE DOUBLE LAMELLAIRE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2015 | Translation filed | 19.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 18.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.04.2014 | AL | 21.10.2020 | CY | 21.10.2020 | CZ | 21.10.2020 | DK | 21.10.2020 | EE | 21.10.2020 | ES | 21.10.2020 | FI | 21.10.2020 | HR | 21.10.2020 | IT | 21.10.2020 | LT | 21.10.2020 | LV | 21.10.2020 | MC | 21.10.2020 | MK | 21.10.2020 | RO | 21.10.2020 | RS | 21.10.2020 | SE | 21.10.2020 | SI | 21.10.2020 | SK | 21.10.2020 | SM | 21.10.2020 | TR | 21.10.2020 | BG | 21.01.2021 | NO | 21.01.2021 | GR | 22.01.2021 | IS | 21.02.2021 | PT | 22.02.2021 | GB | 18.04.2021 | IE | 18.04.2021 | LU | 18.04.2021 | BE | 30.04.2021 | CH | 30.04.2021 | FR | 30.04.2021 | LI | 30.04.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 18.04.2014 | |
AL | 21.10.2020 | ||
CY | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
MK | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
GB | 18.04.2021 | ||
IE | 18.04.2021 | ||
LU | 18.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 18.04.2014 | |
AL | 21.10.2020 | ||
CY | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
GB | 18.04.2021 | ||
IE | 18.04.2021 | ||
LU | 18.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/28] | HU | 18.04.2014 | |
AL | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
GB | 18.04.2021 | ||
IE | 18.04.2021 | ||
LU | 18.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
GB | 18.04.2021 | ||
IE | 18.04.2021 | ||
LU | 18.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
GB | 18.04.2021 | ||
IE | 18.04.2021 | ||
LU | 18.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
GB | 18.04.2021 | ||
IE | 18.04.2021 | ||
LU | 18.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
GB | 18.04.2021 | ||
LU | 18.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
GB | 18.04.2021 | ||
LU | 18.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
LU | 18.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
IT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 21.10.2020 | |
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 21.10.2020 | |
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 21.10.2020 | |
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 21.10.2020 | |
ES | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | ES | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | ES | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | ES | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | ES | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 21.10.2020 | |
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 21.10.2020 | |
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 21.10.2020 | |
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 21.10.2020 | |
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 21.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005075529 (CONSTR RES & TECH GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [AD]EP2412689 (SILKROAD C & T CO LTD [KR]) [AD] 6-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - PLANK J ET AL, "Preparation and characterization of new Ca-Al-polycarboxylate layered double hydroxides", MATERIALS LETTERS, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 60, no. 29-30, ISSN 0167-577X, (20060407), pages 3614 - 3617, (20061201), XP027898360 [A] 6-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]KR19980064529 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]); | [A]KR20060106708 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]); | [A]KR20070028310 (CONSTR RES & TECH GMBH [DE]); | [A]KR20080084973 (CONSTR RES & TECH GMBH [DE]); | [A]KR20120035563 (SILKROAD C & AMP T [KR], et al) | Examination | - Takehiko Ishii ET AL, "New Synthesis of Heterobifunctional Poly(ethylene glycol) Possessing a Pyridyl Disulfide at One End and a Carboxylic Acid at the Other End", Polymer Journal, doi:10.1295/polymj.37.221, (20050101), pages 221 - 228, URL: https://www.nature.com/articles/pj200530.pdf, XP055435668 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1295/polymj.37.221 | by applicant | KR101195825B |