EP3005403 - REFLECTRON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/15] | REFLECTRONS AND METHODS OF PRODUCING AND USING THEM | ||
[2021/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PerkinElmer Health Sciences, Inc. 940 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIAPPETTA, Anthony 45 Kohary Drive Milford, CT 06460 / US | 02 /
STEINER, Urs 61 Sunset Hill Drive Branford, CT 06405 / US | 03 /
FERRARA, Keith 135 Ripton Parish Lane Stratford, CT 06614 / US | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/14] | Marks & Clerk LLP Cambridge 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | ||
Former [2016/15] | Williams, Gareth Owen Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 14804426.6 | 29.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014US39900 | Priority number, date | US201361829181P | 30.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361829181 P | US201361830281P | 03.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361830281 P | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014194023 | Date: | 04.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3005403 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3005403 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/40 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
H01J49/405 (EP,US);
H01J49/067 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REFLEKTRON | [2021/44] | English: | REFLECTRON | [2021/44] | French: | RÉFLECTRON | [2021/44] |
Former [2016/15] | REFLEKTRONEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2016/15] | REFLECTRONS AND METHODS OF PRODUCING AND USING THEM | ||
Former [2016/15] | RÉFLECTRONS ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE ET D'UTILISER CES DERNIERS | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 14.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.10.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22166496.4 / EP4089718 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.05.2014 | AL | 06.04.2022 | AT | 06.04.2022 | CY | 06.04.2022 | CZ | 06.04.2022 | DK | 06.04.2022 | EE | 06.04.2022 | ES | 06.04.2022 | FI | 06.04.2022 | HR | 06.04.2022 | IT | 06.04.2022 | LT | 06.04.2022 | LV | 06.04.2022 | MC | 06.04.2022 | MK | 06.04.2022 | MT | 06.04.2022 | NL | 06.04.2022 | PL | 06.04.2022 | RO | 06.04.2022 | RS | 06.04.2022 | SE | 06.04.2022 | SI | 06.04.2022 | SK | 06.04.2022 | SM | 06.04.2022 | TR | 06.04.2022 | IE | 29.05.2022 | LU | 29.05.2022 | BE | 31.05.2022 | CH | 31.05.2022 | LI | 31.05.2022 | BG | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.07.2022 | GR | 07.07.2022 | IS | 06.08.2022 | PT | 08.08.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 29.05.2014 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CY | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
MK | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
TR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IE | 29.05.2022 | ||
LU | 29.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 29.05.2014 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CY | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
MK | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
IE | 29.05.2022 | ||
LU | 29.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 29.05.2014 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CY | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
IE | 29.05.2022 | ||
LU | 29.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 29.05.2014 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
IE | 29.05.2022 | ||
LU | 29.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
IE | 29.05.2022 | ||
LU | 29.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
IE | 29.05.2022 | ||
LU | 29.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
IE | 29.05.2022 | ||
LU | 29.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
LU | 29.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
LU | 29.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
LU | 29.05.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 06.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3727047 (JANES G) [A] 2 * figures 1,3 ** column 7, line 14 - line 16 *; | [A]US5160840 (VESTAL MARVIN L [US]) [A] 2 * column 3, line 5 - line 8 * * figures 5,12 *; | [XI] - BROCK ANSGAR ET AL, "Characterization of a Hadamard transform time-of-flight mass spectrometer", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20000301), vol. 71, no. 3, doi:10.1063/1.1150456, ISSN 0034-6748, pages 1306 - 1318, XP012038156 [X] 1,3-7 * page 1310, column left, line 17 - line 26 * [I] 2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1150456 | [A] - BERNHARD SPENGLER ET AL, "Metastable decay of peptides and proteins in matrix-assisted laser-desorption mass spectrometry", RAPID COMMUNICATIONS IN MASS SPECTROMETRY., GB, (19910401), vol. 5, no. 4, doi:10.1002/rcm.1290050412, ISSN 0951-4198, pages 198 - 202, XP055317872 [A] 2 * abstract * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/rcm.1290050412 | International search | [A]US2003071208 (HANSEN STUART C [US]); | [A]US2004036029 (BERTSCH JAMES L [US]); | [A]JP2005285543 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [A]US2013009051 (PARK MELVIN ANDREW [US]) | Examination | US2004036029 | - VIALLE J L ET AL, "A CYLINDRICAL REFLECTRON TIME-OF-FLIGHT MASS SPECTROMETER", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, (19970601), vol. 68, no. 6, doi:10.1063/1.1148141, ISSN 0034-6748, pages 2312 - 2318, XP000692958 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1148141 | - LUBMAN D M ET AL, "LINEAR MASS REFLECTRON WITH A LASER PHOTOIONIZATION SOURCE FOR TIME-OF-FLIGHT MASS SPECTROMETRY", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (19830701), vol. 55, no. 8, doi:10.1021/AC00257A013, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 1437 - 1440, XP002064382 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac00257a013 | - Anonymous, "Reflectron - Wikipedia", (20130308), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Reflectron&oldid=542861171, (20210301), XP055780825 | by applicant | - BROCK et al., "Characterization of a Hadamard transform time-of-flight mass spectrometer", Review of Scientific Instruments, (20000300), vol. 71, no. 3, doi:10.1063/1.1150456, pages 1306 - 1318, XP012038156 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1150456 | - SPENGLER et al., "Metastable decay of peptides and proteins in matrix-assisted laser-desorption mass spectrometry", Rapid Communications in Mass Spectrometry, (19910000), vol. 5, doi:10.1002/rcm.1290050412, pages 198 - 202, XP055317872 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/rcm.1290050412 |