EP3004388 - DETECTION AND QUANTIFICATION OF DONOR CELL-FREE DNA IN THE CIRCULATION OF ORGAN TRANSPLANT RECIPIENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2023 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GR | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chronix Biomedical 5941 Optical Court, Suite 203E San Jose, California 95138 / US | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUTZ, Ekkehard Rottenanger 30 Gottingen 37077 / DE | 02 /
BECK, Julia Riemannstrasse 2 Gottingen 37083 / DE | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/22] |
Former [2018/44] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2016/15] | Campbell, Patrick John Henry J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14804474.6 | 29.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014US40055 | Priority number, date | US201361828553P | 29.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361828553 P | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014194113 | Date: | 04.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3004388 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3004388 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3004388 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6883, C12Q1/6881, G01N33/68 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6881 (EP,US);
G01N33/6854 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/106 (US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/16 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/21] | C12Q1/6883, C12Q1/6881 | ||
Former IPC [2016/15] | C12Q1/68, C40B20/08, G06F19/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Title | German: | NACHWEIS UND QUANTIFIZIERUNG VON DONATORZELLENFREIER DNA IM BLUTKREISLAUF VON ORGANTRANSPLANTATEMPFÄNGERN | [2016/15] | English: | DETECTION AND QUANTIFICATION OF DONOR CELL-FREE DNA IN THE CIRCULATION OF ORGAN TRANSPLANT RECIPIENTS | [2016/15] | French: | DÉTECTION ET QUANTIFICATION D'ADN LIBRE EN PROVENANCE DE CELLULES DU DONNEUR DANS LA CIRCULATION SANGUINE DE BÉNÉFICIAIRES D'UNE GREFFE D'ORGANE | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 19.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.2019
ADMISSIBLE Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2019/36] | 12.08.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.12.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.08.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.01.2022 | 05.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 25.01.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 28.09.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.10.2022 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 17.04.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | EE | 31.10.2018 | FI | 31.10.2018 | MK | 31.10.2018 | RS | 31.10.2018 | SK | 31.10.2018 | SM | 31.10.2018 | TR | 31.10.2018 | BG | 31.01.2019 | [2023/50] |
Former [2022/31] | EE | 31.10.2018 | |
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
MK | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | EE | 31.10.2018 | |
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | EE | 31.10.2018 | |
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | EE | 31.10.2018 | |
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | EE | 31.10.2018 | |
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 31.10.2018 | |
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 31.10.2018 | |
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 31.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2012115851 (HOPE CITY [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,10,12 * page 2, [0011]; page 3, [0013]; page 4, [0017] - page 5, [0018]; page 14, [0059]; table 2; examples; claims *; | [E]WO2015138997 (CAREDX INC [US]) [E] 1-5 * claims; example 1 *; | [XY] - YING LI ET AL, "Ready Detection of Donor-Specific Single-Nucleotide Polymorphisms in the Urine of Renal Transplant Recipients by Matrix-Assisted Laser Desorption/Ionization Time-of-Flight Mass Spectrometry", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (20050101), vol. 51, no. 10, doi:10.1373/clinchem.2005.055038, pages 1903 - 1904, XP055325501 [X] 4,5,12 * table 1 * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1373/clinchem.2005.055038 | [XP] - J. BECK ET AL, "Digital Droplet PCR for Rapid Quantification of Donor DNA in the Circulation of Transplant Recipients as a Potential Universal Biomarker of Graft Injury", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (20131201), vol. 59, no. 12, doi:10.1373/clinchem.2013.210328, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 1732 - 1741, XP055214461 [XP] 1-15 * pages 1733-1734, "Material and methods" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1373/clinchem.2013.210328 | [Y] - T. M. SNYDER ET AL, "Universal noninvasive detection of solid organ transplant rejection", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20110328), vol. 108, no. 15, doi:10.1073/pnas.1013924108, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 6229 - 6234, XP055129832 [Y] 1-15 * Figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1013924108 | International search | [Y]EP1325963 (HOLZGREVE WOLFGANG PROF [CH], et al); | [Y]US2010209926 (ALAOUI HICHAM [US], et al); | [Y]US2012115737 (EHRICH MATHIAS [US], et al) | by applicant | WO9208800 | US5399491 | US5409818 | US5437990 | US5455166 | US5679785 | US5728525 | US5750343 | US5789562 | US5844106 | US5955589 | US6001611 | US6440706 | US6753147 | US7824889 | - SNYDER et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20110000), vol. 108, pages 6229 - 6234 | - LO, Clin Chem, (20110000), vol. 57, pages 941 - 942 | - BECK et al., Clin Chem, (20090000), vol. 55, pages 730 - 738 | - LO et al., Sci Transl Med, (20100000), vol. 2, page 61ra91 | - JELINEK; SCHMID, Ann. Rev. Biochem., (19820000), vol. 51, pages 831 - 844 | - HARDMAN, Biochem J., (19860000), vol. 234, pages 1 - 11 | - VOGT, Hum. Genet., (19900000), vol. 84, pages 301 - 306 | - JURKA et al., Cytogenet Genome Res, (20050000), vol. 1, no. 10, pages 462 - 7 | - WU; WALLACE, Genomics, (19880000), vol. 4, pages 560 - 569 | - WALKER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 392 - 396 | - KWOH et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19890000), vol. 86, pages 1173 - 1177 | - GUATELLI et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 1874 - 1878 | - KRAMER; LIZARDI, Nature, (19890000), vol. 339, pages 401 - 402 | - LOMELI et al., Clin. Chem., (19890000), vol. 35, pages 1826 - 1831 | - MAKRIGIORGOS et al., Nature Biotechnol, (20020000), vol. 20, pages 936 - 9 | - GUATELLI et al., PNAS USA, (19900000), vol. 87, page 1874 | - KALINA et al., NAR, (19970000), vol. 25, pages 1999 - 2004 | - VOGELSTEIN; KINZLER, PNAS, (19990000), vol. 96, pages 9236 - 9241 | - SCHUTZ; AHSEN, Biotechniques, (19990000), vol. 27, pages 1218 - 1222,1224 | - MARKY; BRESLAUER, Biopolymers, (19870000), vol. 26, pages 1601 - 1620 | - BECK et al., Clin Chem, (20090000), vol. 55, pages 730 - 38 | - BECK et al., Clin Chem, (20130000), vol. 59, pages 1732 - 41 | - OELLERICH et al., Ther Dug Monit, (20140000), vol. 36, pages 136 - 140 | Opposition | WO2008098142 | US2012115737 | WO2012115851 | WO2013159035 | - LI et al., "Ready Detection of Donor-Specific Single Nucleotide Polymorphisms in the Urine of Renal Transplant Recipients by Matrix-Assisted Laser Desorption/lonization Time-of-Flight Mass Spectroscopy", Clinical Chemistry, (20050101), vol. 51, no. 10, pages 1903 - 1904, XP055325501 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1373/clinchem.2005.055038 | - BECK et al., "Digital Droplet PCR for Rapid Quantification of Donor DNA in the Circulation of Transplant Recipients as a Potential Universal Biomarker of Graft Injury", Clinical Chemistry, (20131201), vol. 59, no. 1 2, pages 1732 - 1741, XP055214461 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1373/clinchem.2013.210328 | - SNYDER et al., "Universal noninvasive detection of solid organ transplant rejection", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, (20110308), vol. 108, no. 15, pages 6229 - 6234, XP055129832 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1013924108 | - HIDESTRAND et al., "254 Highly Sensitive Transplant Rejection Surveillance Using Targeted Detection of Donor Specific Cell Free DNA", The Journal of Heart and Lung Transplantation, (20120400), vol. 31, no. 4S, XP028911538 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.healun.2012.01.261 | - SPARKS et al., "Noninvasive prenatal detection and selective analysis of cell-free DNA obtained from maternal blood: evaluation for trisomy 21 and trisomy 18", American Journal of Obstetrics & Gynecology, (20120400), vol. 206, no. 4, pages 319.e1 - 319.e9, XP055024123 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ajog.2012.01.030 | - GINEIKIENE et al., "Single Nucleotide Polymorphism-Based System Improves the Applicability of Quantitative PCR for Chimerism Monitoring", Journal of Molecular Diagnostics, (20090100), vol. 11, no. 1, doi:10.2353/jmoldx.2009.080039, XP055046105 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2353/jmoldx.2009.080039 | - LI et al., "Ready Detection of Donor-Specific Single Nucleotide Polymorphisms in the Urine of Renal Transplant Recipients by Matrix-Assisted Laser Desorption/lonization Time-of-Flight Mass Spectroscopy", Clinical Chemistry, (20050101), vol. 51, no. 10, pages 1903 - 1904 | - HIDESTRAND et al., "254 Highly Sensitive Transplant Rejection Surveillance Using Targeted Detection of Donor Specific Cell Free DNA", The Journal of Heart and Lung Transplantation, (20120400), vol. 31, no. 4S | - SPARKS et al., "Noninvasive prenatal detection and selective analysis of cell-free DNA obtained from maternal blood: evaluation for trisomy 21 and trisomy 18", American Journal of Obstetrics & Gynecology, (20120400), vol. 206, no. 4, pages 319.e1 - 319.e9 | - GINEIKIENE et al., "Single Nucleotide Polymorphism-Based System Improves the Applicability of Quantitative PCR for Chimerism Monitoring", Journal of Molecular Diagnostics, (20090100), vol. 11, no. 1, doi:10.2353/jmoldx.2009.080039 |