EP3003485 - COMPOSITION COMPRISING BETA-CASEIN A2 FOR USE IN THE PREVENTION OF INFLAMMATION OF THE BOWEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.10.2023 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | ||
Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | Revocation of patent | published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] |
Applicant(s) | For all designated states The A2 Milk Company Limited Level 10 51 Shortland Street Auckland 1010 / NZ | ||
[2019/16] | |||
Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARKE, Andrew John 14 Cleveland Road Parnell Auckland 1052 / NZ | ||
02 /
TRIVEDI, Malav Suchin 2401 Madison Street Hollywood, Florida 33020 / US | |||
[2019/21] | |||
Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | ||
[N/P] | |||
Application number, filing date | 14804528.9 | 30.05.2014 | |
[2016/15] | |||
WO2014NZ00102 | |||
Priority number, date | US201361829764P | 31.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361829764 P | |
[2016/15] | |||
Filing language | EN | ||
Procedural language | EN | ||
Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | |
No.: | WO2014193248 | ||
Date: | 04.12.2014 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
[2014/49] | |||
Type: | A1 Application with search report | ||
No.: | EP3003485 | ||
Date: | 13.04.2016 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | |||
[2016/15] | |||
Type: | B1 Patent specification | ||
No.: | EP3003485 | ||
Date: | 15.05.2019 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
[2019/20] | |||
Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 04.12.2014 |
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2016 | |
Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17, A61K35/20, A61P1/00 | [2016/48] |
CPC: |
A61K38/1709 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K35/20 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A23K20/147 (EP,IL,US);
| ||
Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | ||
Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | |
ME | Not yet paid | ||
Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT BETA-CASEIN A2 ZUR PRÄVENTION VON ENTZÜNDUNGEN DES DARMS | [2018/50] |
English: | COMPOSITION COMPRISING BETA-CASEIN A2 FOR USE IN THE PREVENTION OF INFLAMMATION OF THE BOWEL | [2018/50] | |
French: | COMPOSITION COMPRENANT DE LA BÊTA-CASÉINE A2 POUR SON UTILISATION DANS LA PRÉVENTION D'UNE INFLAMMATION DE L'INTESTIN | [2018/50] | |
Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | |
04.01.2016 | Search fee paid | ||
04.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | ||
04.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | ||
Examination procedure | 04.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/15] | |
01.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | ||
27.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | ||
05.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | ||
05.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | ||
05.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | ||
Divisional application(s) | EP19169044.5 / EP3542813 | ||
Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.02.2020
17.02.2020
ADMISSIBLE Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Else-Krömer-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE Opponent's representative Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al, et al Patent Department Pharmaceuticals Division Borkenberg 14 61440 Oberursel / DE | |
02
17.02.2020
19.02.2020
ADMISSIBLE Arla Foods amba Sønderhøj 14 8260 Viby J / DK Opponent's representative Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | |||
[2020/13] | |||
03.03.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | ||
11.09.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | ||
08.12.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | ||
25.01.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | ||
25.01.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | ||
05.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | ||
15.10.2023 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2023/47] | ||
Appeal following opposition | 04.04.2022 | Appeal received No. T0665/22 | |
04.04.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | ||
07.06.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | ||
19.09.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | ||
05.10.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | ||
01.04.2022 | Appeal received No. T0665/22 | ||
01.04.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | ||
01.06.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | ||
19.09.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | ||
05.10.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | ||
10.03.2022 | Appeal received No. T0665/22 | ||
10.03.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | ||
23.05.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | ||
19.09.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | ||
05.10.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | ||
Fees paid | Renewal fee | ||
30.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | ||
30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | ||
28.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | ||
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.05.2014 | |
AL | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
MK | 15.05.2019 | ||
MT | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LU | 30.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
[2022/31] | |||
Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]NZ306584 (CORRAN NORMAN STUART MCLACHLAN); | |
[XYI]NZ516712 (NEW ZEALAND MILK INST LTD); | |||
[XYI]AU2004206984 (CORRAN MCLACHLAN); | |||
International search | [X]WO0100047 (NEW ZEALAND MILK INST LTD [NZ], et al); | ||
[X]WO2004030690 (A2 CORP LTD [NZ], et al); | |||
[A]WO2008041219 (KERRY GROUP SERVICES INT LTD [IE], et al); | |||
Opposition | WO0219832 | ||
WO2004030690 | |||
WO9636239 | |||
US2003221202 | |||
US2006280802 |