EP3007255 - NEGATIVE ELECTRODE MATERIAL FOR LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Showa Denko K.K. 13-9, Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Takeshi c/o SHOWA DENKO K.K. 13-9 Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | 02 /
ISHII, Nobuaki c/o SHOWA DENKO K.K. 13-9 Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | 03 /
HIRANO, Yuta c/o SHOWA DENKO K.K. 13-9 Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2016/15] | Application number, filing date | 14804705.3 | 30.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014JP64375 | Priority number, date | JP20130116201 | 31.05.2013 Original published format: JP 2013116201 | [2016/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014192906 | Date: | 04.12.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3007255 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/02, H01M4/133, H01M4/134, H01M4/1393, H01M4/1395, H01M4/36, H01M4/38, H01M4/46, H01M4/587, H01M4/62, H01M10/0525 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
H01M4/587 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/133 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/052 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (US);
H01M4/134 (EP,US);
H01M4/1393 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/1395 (EP,US);
H01M4/36 (KR);
H01M4/362 (EP,US);
H01M4/38 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/386 (EP,US);
H01M4/387 (EP,US);
H01M4/463 (EP,US);
H01M4/62 (KR);
H01M4/625 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | H01M4/62, H01M4/133, H01M4/1393, H01M4/36, H01M4/38, H01M4/587 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Title | German: | NEGATIVELEKTRODENMATERIAL FÜR LITHIUM-IONEN-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIEN | [2016/15] | English: | NEGATIVE ELECTRODE MATERIAL FOR LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY | [2016/15] | French: | MATÉRIAU D'ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM-ION | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2015 | Translation filed | 31.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 31.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 31.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 31.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/49] | 26.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011163274 (PLEE DOMINIQUE [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8 * paragraphs [0028] , [0 53] - [0054] * [I] 3,4; | [X]US2010092868 (KIM HYUNG-SUN [KR], et al) [X] 1,3,5,8 * figures 2, 3 * * paragraphs [0060] , [ 113] - [0014] - [ 120] - [0121] *; | [E]EP2760067 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [E] 1-8 * figure 4; tables 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0035] , [0 82] - [0084] - [0 93] - [0099] *; | [E]EP2778266 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [E] 1-4,6-8 * figures 5, 9; table 2 * * paragraphs [0060] - [0061] - [0 66] - [0067] - [0 75] - [0078] * | International search | [X]JP2012501515 (ARKEMA FRANCE); | [X]JP2012099341 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [A]JP2005268120 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JP2004349164 (NEC CORP) | by applicant | JP2006269110 | CN101399337B | JP2012501515 |