EP3007357 - SURFACE ACOUSTIC WAVE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIKUCHI, Taku c/o Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 10-1 Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | 02 /
FUKUSHIMA, Masahiro c/o Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 10-1 Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14804827.5 | 21.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014JP63447 | Priority number, date | JP20130110688 | 27.05.2013 Original published format: JP 2013110688 | JP20130189972 | 13.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013189972 | [2016/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014192614 | Date: | 04.12.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3007357 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3007357 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/02, H03H9/10, H03H9/145, // H01L23/02, H01L23/08 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
H03H9/02897 (EP,US);
H03H9/25 (US);
H03H9/02574 (EP,US);
H03H9/02834 (EP,US);
H03H9/02992 (EP,US);
H03H9/1071 (EP,US);
H03H9/02559 (EP,US);
H03H9/02929 (EP,US);
H03H9/1042 (EP,US);
H03H9/14541 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | H03H9/25, H01L23/02, H01L23/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENSCHALLWELLENREGELUNG | [2016/15] | English: | SURFACE ACOUSTIC WAVE DEVICE | [2016/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF À ONDES ACOUSTIQUES DE SURFACE | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2015 | Translation filed | 17.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 17.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 21.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.05.2014 | AL | 01.05.2019 | AT | 01.05.2019 | CY | 01.05.2019 | CZ | 01.05.2019 | DK | 01.05.2019 | EE | 01.05.2019 | ES | 01.05.2019 | FI | 01.05.2019 | HR | 01.05.2019 | IT | 01.05.2019 | LT | 01.05.2019 | LV | 01.05.2019 | MC | 01.05.2019 | MK | 01.05.2019 | MT | 01.05.2019 | NL | 01.05.2019 | PL | 01.05.2019 | RO | 01.05.2019 | RS | 01.05.2019 | SE | 01.05.2019 | SI | 01.05.2019 | SK | 01.05.2019 | SM | 01.05.2019 | TR | 01.05.2019 | IE | 21.05.2019 | LU | 21.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | FR | 01.07.2019 | BG | 01.08.2019 | GB | 01.08.2019 | NO | 01.08.2019 | GR | 02.08.2019 | IS | 01.09.2019 | PT | 01.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 21.05.2014 | |
AL | 01.05.2019 | ||
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
MT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 21.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 01.07.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
GB | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 21.05.2014 | |
AL | 01.05.2019 | ||
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 21.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 01.07.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
GB | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 21.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 01.07.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
GB | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 21.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 01.07.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
GB | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 21.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 01.07.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 21.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 21.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
LU | 21.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004233020 (NAKAMURA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4 * figures 1a, 1b, 10a, 10b, 11a, 11b, 19 *; | [A]US2010277035 (KUDO HAYAMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4* figures 2, 4, 5 *; | [Y]WO2012132147 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0029] - [0051]; figures 1A, 1B, 2A, 2B, 3C *; | [P]US2014003017 (KAI SEIJI [JP], et al) | International search | [Y]JPS54118150 (NIPPON DENSHI KOGYO SHINKO, et al); | [Y]JP2002261582 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2008078739 (FUJITSU MEDIA DEVICE KK, et al) | by applicant | JPH1188101 | - JEDJESD 22-A104C specified by JEDEC, SOLID STATE TECHNOLOGY ASSOCIATION |