EP2997362 - LIQUID SAMPLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universita' Degli Studi di Firenze Piazza San Marco 4 50121 Firenze / IT | [2016/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASAGLI, Nicola Via di San Jacopo 1583 I-50036 Vaglia (FI) / IT | 02 /
MUGNAI, Francesco Via del Fornello n°5 I-50053 Empoli / IT | 03 /
ALLOTTA, Benedetto Via Giuseppe Gori 36 I-56028 San Miniato (PI) / IT | 04 /
BARTOLINI, Fabio Via G. Di Vittorio 7 I-51034 Casalguidi (PT) / IT | 05 /
COSTANZI, Riccardo Via G. d' Annunzio 44 I-50135 Firenze / IT | 06 /
MONNI, Niccolò Via C. dei Medici 5 I-59016 Poggio a Caiano (PO) / IT | 07 /
RIDOLFI, Alessandro Via Q. Sella 10 I-50136 Firenze / IT | 08 /
PUGI, Luca Via Masaccio 3 I-59016 Poggio a Caiano (PO) / IT | 09 /
NATALINI, Marco Via Lungo Stella 13 I-51034 Casalguidi (PT) / IT | 10 /
MEROI, Silvano Località Variney n°33 I-11010 Gignod (AO) / IT | [2016/12] | Representative(s) | Celestino, Marco ABM Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi, Viale Giovanni Pisano, 31 56123 Pisa / IT | [2016/12] | Application number, filing date | 14805347.3 | 14.05.2014 | [2016/12] | WO2014IB61425 | Priority number, date | IT2013PI00042 | 14.05.2013 Original published format: IT PI20130042 | [2016/12] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015011579 | Date: | 29.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2997362 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/18, G01N1/14 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
G01N1/14 (EP);
G01N33/18 (EP);
G01N2001/1427 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSPROBENEHMER | [2016/12] | English: | LIQUID SAMPLER | [2016/12] | French: | STRUCTURE AMÉLIORÉE D'ÉCHANTILLONNEUR POUR INSPECTIONS SOUS-MARINES | [2016/12] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 28.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/16] | 01.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3277723 (BODMAN RALPH H, et al) [X] 1,5,6,10-13 * column 2, line 55 - column 4, line 9; figures 1-2 * [I] 2-4,7-9,14-16; | [XI]WO2012016063 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * paragraphs [0026] - [0043]; figures 1-4 * [I] 2-4,6-16; | [A]CN101403660 (YU ZHENG [CN]) [A] 1-10 * page 4, top paragraph of machine translation;; figure 8 * | [XI] - BIRD L E ET AL, "Development of an Active, Large Volume, Discrete Seawater Sampler for Autonomous Underwater Vehicles", OCEANS 2007, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20070929), pages 1 - 5, XP031229146 [X] 1,5,6,10-13 * paragraph [0III] * [I] 2-4,7-9,14-16 | by applicant | US3277723 | WO2012016063 |