Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016149539 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IN728DE2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015094508 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IN5840CH2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10372161 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2019 | B2 | US2016195899 | 07.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IN5840CH2013 | US201615072999 | 17.03.2016 | WO2014US64470 | 07.11.2014 | IN728DE2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3271797 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2018 | A4 | EP3271797 | 24.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US22947 | 17.03.2016 | IN728DE2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105659186 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | IN5840CH2013 | WO2014US64470 | 07.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3084550 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2020 | B1 | EP3084550 | 26.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IN5840CH2013 | WO2014US64470 | 07.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2929175 | 25.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IN5840CH2013 | WO2014US64470 | 07.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN5840CHE2013 | 19.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | IN5840CH2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | USD776119S | 10.01.2017 | S | Priority number | Date | IN5840CH2013 | WO2014US64470 | 07.11.2014 |