EP3004134 - PEPTIDE LIGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Sydney Parramatta Road Sydney New South Wales 2006 / AU | [2019/08] |
Former [2016/15] | For all designated states The University Of Sydney Parramatta Road The University of Sydney New South Wales 2006 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAYNE, Richard, J. Unit 11 1 Gibson Street Camperdown NSW 2050 / AU | 02 /
THOMPSON, Robert, E. 25/471 South Dowling Street Surry Hills NSW 2026 / AU | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2016/15] | Application number, filing date | 14806955.2 | 04.06.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014AU00583 | Priority number, date | AU20130902006 | 04.06.2013 Original published format: AU 2013902006 | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014194361 | Date: | 11.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3004134 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3004134 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 11.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/107, C07C319/02, C07C321/04, C07K7/06, C07K7/08, C07C319/14, C07C323/59 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
C07C319/02 (EP,US);
C07K1/062 (US);
C07C319/14 (EP,US);
C07K1/026 (EP,US);
C07K1/1072 (EP,US);
C07K7/08 (US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C319/02, C07C323/58 (US,EP);
C07C319/02, C07C323/59 (US,EP);
C07C319/14, C07C323/59 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | C07K1/107, C07C319/02, C07C321/04, C07K7/06, C07K7/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PEPTIDLIGATION | [2016/15] | English: | PEPTIDE LIGATION | [2016/15] | French: | LIGATURE PEPTIDIQUE | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 17.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 28.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 23.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.06.2014 | AL | 27.02.2019 | AT | 27.02.2019 | CY | 27.02.2019 | CZ | 27.02.2019 | EE | 27.02.2019 | ES | 27.02.2019 | FI | 27.02.2019 | HR | 27.02.2019 | IT | 27.02.2019 | LT | 27.02.2019 | LV | 27.02.2019 | MK | 27.02.2019 | MT | 27.02.2019 | NL | 27.02.2019 | PL | 27.02.2019 | RO | 27.02.2019 | RS | 27.02.2019 | SE | 27.02.2019 | SI | 27.02.2019 | SK | 27.02.2019 | SM | 27.02.2019 | TR | 27.02.2019 | BG | 27.05.2019 | NO | 27.05.2019 | GR | 28.05.2019 | IS | 27.06.2019 | PT | 27.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 04.06.2014 | |
AL | 27.02.2019 | ||
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 04.06.2014 | |
AL | 27.02.2019 | ||
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 27.02.2019 | |
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X] - CAS, (20041116), Database accession no. 781601-14-7, URL: STN, XP055297229 [X] 40-43 * 4-mercapto-glutamic acid * | [X] - CAS, (20030305), Database accession no. 496919-12-1, URL: STN, XP055297234 [X] 40-43 * 3-mercapto-L-aspartic acid * | [X] - KRASNOV V. P. et al., "Synthesis of 4-mercaptoglytamic acid derivatives", Russian Journal of Organic Chemistry ''., (19990000), vol. 35, no. 4, pages 572 - 577, XP 008181363 [X] 40-43 * Scheme 2 and compound VIII page 573 * | [XY] - SHIBATA N. et al., "Electrophilic sulfenylation in a stereocontrolled synthesis of protected (2R,3R)-3-mercaptoaspartic acid from L-aspartic acid", Tetrahedron, (19960000), vol. 52, no. 39, pages 12839 - 12852, XP 055297177 [X] 1-16 * Scheme 1 and compound 8 page 12840, compound 13 page 12841, Scheme 4 page 12842, compound 18 Scheme 5, compound 22 Scheme 7 page 12843 and compound 24 and 25 Scheme 9 page 12844 Whole document * [Y] 17-18, 20, 22-26, 28, 30-35 and 37 | [XY] - SHIBATA N . et al., "A stereocontrolled synthesis of protected (2R,3R)-3- mercaptoaspartic acid via a beta-aspartyl enolate sulfenylation", Synlett., (19960000), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1055/s-1996-5490, pages 519 - 520, XP 001182595 [X] 1-16 * Scheme 1 page 519, compound 7 page 519, compound 12 Scheme 2 and Scheme 3 page 519 and compounds 18 19, 20 and 21 Scheme 4 page 520 Whole document * [Y] 17-18, 20, 22-26, 28, 30-35 and 37 | [Y] - HASSE C. et al., "Native Chemical Ligation at Valine", Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20080000), vol. 47, pages 6807 - 6810, XP 008146650 [Y] 17-18, 20, 22-26, 28, 31-35 and 37 * see Fig. 1 page 6808 and Fig. 2 page 6809 * | [Y] - SIMAN P. et al., "Chemical Synthesis and Expression of the HIV-1 Rev Protein", ChemBioChem., (20110000), vol. 12, pages 1097 - 1104, XP 000051763 [Y] 17-18, 20, 22-26, 28, 30-35 and 37 * "One-pot synthesis of Rev protein" page 1102 * | [Y] - CHEN J . et al., "A program tor ligation at threonine sites: application to the controlled total synthesis of glycopeptides", Tetrahedron ., (20100000), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1016/j.tet.2010.01.067, pages 2277 - 2283, XP 026932573 [Y] 17-18, 20, 22-26, 28, 31-35 and 37 * Table 1 page 2279 * | [Y] - TAN Z. et al., "Insights into the Finer Issues of Native Chemical Ligation: An Approach to Cascade Ligations", Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20100000), vol. 49, pages 9500 - 9503, XP 055297182 [Y] 17-18, 20, 22-26, 28, 31-35 and 37 * Table 1 page 9501 * | [A] - SIMAN P. et al., "Native chemical ligation at glutamine", Organic Letters., (20120000), vol. 14, no. 6, pages 1520 - 1523, XP 055297183 [A] 1-43 * see whole document especially Scheme 2 page 1521 and the last paragraph column 1 page 1523 * | [PX] - THOMPSON, R. E. et al., "Chemoselective Peptide Ligation-Desulfurization at Aspaitate", Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20130000), vol. 52, no. 37, pages 9723 - 9727, XP 055297184 [PX] 1-18 and 20-43 * see whole document * | [PX] - THOMPSON, R. E. et al., "Trifluoroethanethiol: An Additive for Efficient One-Pot Peptide Ligation -Desulfurization Chemistry", J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20140000), vol. 136, pages 8161 - 8164, XP 055297185 [PX] 1-43 * see whole document * |