EP3006199 - LIGHT-REFLECTIVE FILM AND EDGE LIGHT-TYPE BACKLIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8666 / JP | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWATA Yuji c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 02 /
WAKAHARA Ryuichi c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA Shotaro c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-8558 / JP | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14807296.0 | 03.06.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014JP64752 | Priority number, date | JP20130120372 | 07.06.2013 Original published format: JP 2013120372 | [2016/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014196534 | Date: | 11.12.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3006199 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B32B7/02, F21S2/00, F21V7/00, F21V7/04, G02B5/08 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
G02B5/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | B32B7/02, F21S2/00, F21V7/00, F21V7/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Title | German: | LICHTREFLEKTIERENDER FILM UND KANTENRÜCKBELEUCHTUNG | [2016/15] | English: | LIGHT-REFLECTIVE FILM AND EDGE LIGHT-TYPE BACKLIGHT | [2016/15] | French: | FILM RÉFLÉCHISSANT LA LUMIÈRE ET RÉTRO-ÉCLAIRAGE DE TYPE LUMIÈRE LATÉRALE | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2015 | Translation filed | 02.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 14.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/02] | 22.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2012135952 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0027] , [0032] - [0034] - [0038]; tables 1-3 *; | [Y]JP2000082313 (ENPLAS CORP, et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0036] , [0037] , [0039] , [0045] , [0050]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2010034987 (FUJII HIDEKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0075] * | International search | [Y]JP2012135952 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JP2000082313 (ENPLAS CORP, et al) | by applicant | JP2003092018 | JP2008512719 | JP2010230804 |