EP3006443 - BENZOTHIOPHENE COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astellas Pharma Inc. 5-1, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIHARA, Tsukasa c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 5-1 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 02 /
IKEGAI, Kazuhiro c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 5-1 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 03 /
KURIWAKI, Ikumi c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 5-1 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 04 /
HISAMICHI, Hiroyuki c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 5-1 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 05 /
TAKESHITA, Nobuaki c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 5-1 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 06 /
TAKEZAWA, Ryuichi c/o Astellas Pharma Inc. 5-1 Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 14807340.6 | 06.06.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014JP65141 | Priority number, date | JP20130119416 | 06.06.2013 Original published format: JP 2013119416 | [2016/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014196644 | Date: | 11.12.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3006443 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3006443 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07D409/10, A61K31/4025, A61K31/4535, A61K31/5377, A61K31/551, A61P19/02, A61P21/00, A61P25/04, A61P29/00, A61P43/00, C07D413/10 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
A61K31/5377 (EP,RU,US);
C07D409/10 (EP,RU,US);
A61K31/4025 (EP,RU,US);
A61K31/4535 (EP,RU,US);
A61K31/551 (EP,RU,US);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP,RU);
A61P29/00 (EP,RU);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | 01.12.2015 | ME | 01.12.2015 | Title | German: | BENZOTHIOPHENVERBINDUNG | [2016/15] | English: | BENZOTHIOPHENE COMPOUND | [2016/15] | French: | COMPOSÉ BENZOTHIOPHÈNE | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2015 | Translation filed | 01.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 26.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO02062745 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al); | [A]WO2008054435 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) | International search | [XA]JP2004532188 ; | [A]JP2006522130 ; | [A]US2009069305 (GAUL MICHAEL D [US], et al); | [A]JP2012508010 |