EP3004845 - HYBRID FIBER OPTIC PROBE DEVICE FOR ATTENUATED TOTAL REFLECTION SPECTROSCOPIC APPLICATIONS IN UV, VISIBLE AND IR RANGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pims Passive Imaging Medical Systems Ltd. 17 Harav Alfasi St 8881000 Be'er Sheva / IL | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEN-ZION, Dekel 11 Levitas St. 3849472 Hadera / IL | 02 /
ZILBERMAN, Arkadi 36 Zalman Aran st. Beer Sheeba 8478992 / IL | 03 /
KLEIN, Ronnie 12 Yona Angel St. 34952 Haifa / IL | 04 /
COHEN, Yaniv 5 Yehoshua Ben Gamla St. 93188 Jerusalem / IL | 05 /
BLAUNSTEIN, Nathan 17 Alfasi St. 8475120 Beer Sheeba / IL | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Gallo, Luca Gallo & Partners S.r.l. Via Rezzonico, 6 35131 Padova / IT | [2016/15] | Application number, filing date | 14807377.8 | 03.06.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014IL50504 | Priority number, date | US201361830651P | 04.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361830651 P | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014195949 | Date: | 11.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3004845 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 11.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/552, G01N21/85, G02B6/032, G02B6/26 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
G01N21/552 (EP,US);
G01N21/8507 (EP,US);
G02B6/02328 (EP,US);
G02B6/262 (EP,US);
C03C25/10 (US);
G01N2021/8542 (EP,US);
G02B6/032 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | G01N21/55, G01N21/85 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Title | German: | HYBRIDE GLASFASERSONDENVORRICHTUNG FÜR SPEKTROSKOPISCHE ANWENDUNGEN MIT GEDÄMPFTER TOTALREFLEXION IN SICHTBAREN UV- UND IR-BEREICHEN | [2016/15] | English: | HYBRID FIBER OPTIC PROBE DEVICE FOR ATTENUATED TOTAL REFLECTION SPECTROSCOPIC APPLICATIONS IN UV, VISIBLE AND IR RANGES | [2016/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SONDE A FIBRE OPTIQUE HYBRIDE POUR APPLICATIONS SPECTROSCOPIQUES EN REFLEXION TOTALE ATTENUEE DANS LES PLAGES DE L'ULTRAVIOLET (UV), DU VISIBLE ET DE L'INFRAROUGE (IR) | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 01.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/31] | 09.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE4414975 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * column 3, lines 48-66; figures 1,3 *; | [Y]US7763009 (WEISS JONATHAN D [US]) [Y] 1-10 * column 3, lines 37-54; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2005046807 (HANANO KAZUNARI [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0138]; figure 14 *; | [A]US6104853 (MIYAGI MITSUNOBU [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 1A *; | [Y]US4830462 (KARNY ZIV [IL], et al) [Y] 3,4 * column 3, lines 1-34; figure 1 *; | [Y]US6122041 (NAJM HABIB [US], et al) [Y] 3,4 * column 2, lines 50-63; figure - * | [Y] - HEISE H M ET AL, "Attenuated total reflection mid-infrared spectroscopy for clinical chemistry applications using silver halide fibers", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B: CHEMICAL: INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL DEVOTED TO RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT OF PHYSICAL AND CHEMICAL TRANSDUCERS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (19980831), vol. 51, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/S0925-4005(98)00231-7, ISSN 0925-4005, pages 84 - 91, XP004153993 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * Section 2. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-4005(98)00231-7 | International search | [Y]US5926269 (VON DER ELTZ ANDREAS [DE], et al) [Y] 9 * Abstract | Figs 2, 6b & 6a | Col 4 - examples 2-3 *; | [Y]US2011170116 (HOMA DANIEL S [US], et al) [Y] 5,10,11 * Fig 3; 30, 33, 34 | ¶ [0023], [0029]-[0030] *; | [XY]US2006153502 (GIOTTO FRANK [US], et al) [X] 8 * Figs 2-6 | ¶ [0032], [0037] Figs 2-6 | ¶ [0032], [0037] * [Y] 5,9-11; | [A]US6200502 (PAATZSCH THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-12; | [A]DE4038354 (BRUKER ANALYTISCHE MESSTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1-12; | [A]US5436454 (BORNSTEIN AHARON [US], et al) [A] 1-12; | [A]US5585634 (STEVENSON WILLIAM A [US], et al) [A] 1-12; | [A]US2006285797 (LITTLE BRENT E [US]) [A] 1-12 |