EP3004853 - STAY CABLE ASSESSMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National ICT Australia Limited Level 5, 13 Garden Street Eveleigh, NSW 2015 / AU | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERRIMAN, Rodney c/- Level 5 13 Garden Street Eveleigh, New South Wales 2015 / AU | 02 /
LEITNER, Matthias c/- Level 5 13 Garden Street Eveleigh, New South Wales 2015 / AU | 03 /
MAYR, Philipp c/- Level 5 13 Garden Street Eveleigh, New South Wales 2015 / AU | 04 /
OTT, Maximilian c/- Level 5 13 Garden Street Eveleigh, New South Wales 2015 / AU | 05 /
RUNCIE, Peter c/- Level 5 13 Garden Street Eveleigh, New South Wales 2015 / AU | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Legg, Cyrus James Grahame Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [2016/15] | Application number, filing date | 14807694.6 | 11.06.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014AU50069 | Priority number, date | AU20130902003 | 04.06.2013 Original published format: AU 2013902003 | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014194384 | Date: | 11.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3004853 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 11.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/00, G01B7/00, G01L5/00 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
G01R31/54 (EP,US);
E01D19/10 (EP,US);
E01D22/00 (EP,US);
G01N27/00 (US);
G01R31/52 (EP,US);
G01R31/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHRÄGSEILBEURTEILUNG | [2016/15] | English: | STAY CABLE ASSESSMENT | [2016/15] | French: | ÉVALUATION DE CÂBLE DE HAUBANAGE | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 05.07.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5456113 (KWUN HEGEON [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * Whole document, in particular: Abstract, col. 5 lines 31-64, col. 6 lines 25-41, col. 7 line 23 - col. 8 line 54, col. 9 lines 3-12, col. 10 lines 44-61, col. 11 line 3 - col. 12 line 38, col. 13 lines 13-43, col. 141ine 31-50, figs 1-4, 6-10. *; | [A]JPH09304354 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-14* Whole document * | [X] - XU, JIANG. et al., "A Magnetic Flux Leakage and Magnetostrictive Guided Wave Hybrid Transducer for Detecting Bridge Cables", Sensors, (20120000), vol. 12, ISSN 1424-8220, pages 518 - 533 [X] 1-14 * . Whole document, in particular: Abstract, page 519 last paragraph, page 521-522 section 2, page 527 step 1- step 4, Page 527-528 section 4.2, page 529 first paragraph after fig 14, figs 2-5, 12. * |