EP3004154 - IL-1beta-IL-1Ra CHIMERA AND METHODS OF USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ben Gurion University of The Negev Research and Development Authority P.O.B. 653 84105 Beer Sheva / IL | For all designated states The Regents of the University of Colorado, a body corporate 1800 Grant Street, 8th Floor Denver, CO 80203 / US | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEWIS, Eli 29 Max Bourne Street 84835 Beer Sheva / IL | 02 /
RIDER, Peleg Tse'ela St. 14 8496500 Omer / IL | 03 /
DINARELLO, Charles A. 333 15th STreet Boulder, Colorado 80302 / US | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 14807762.1 | 05.06.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014IL50508 | Priority number, date | US201361831318P | 05.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361831318 P | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014195953 | Date: | 11.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3004154 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 11.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/545, A61P29/00, C07K19/00, C12N15/62 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
A61K38/2006 (EP,US);
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07K14/47 (US);
C07K14/545 (EP,US);
C07K14/7155 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/21 (EP,US);
C07K2319/50 (EP,US);
C07K2319/74 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Title | German: | IL-1-BETTA-IL-1RA-CHIMÄRE UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2016/15] | English: | IL-1beta-IL-1Ra CHIMERA AND METHODS OF USING THE SAME | [2016/15] | French: | CHIMÈRES IL-1BÊTA-IL-1RA ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 29.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/46] | 27.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011123683 (UNIV ROCHESTER [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-44 *; | [XI]WO2012016203 (ELEVEN BIOTHERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7,8,10-15 * claims 1-70; sequences 17-24 * [I] 2,4-6,9; | [XI] - CHARLES A. DINARELLO ET AL, "Treating inflammation by blocking interleukin-1 in a broad spectrum of diseases", NATURE REVIEWS DRUG DISCOVERY, (20120801), vol. 11, no. 8, doi:10.1038/nrd3800, ISSN 1474-1776, pages 633 - 652, XP055051238 [X] 1,3,7,12-15 * pages 640, 648 * [I] 2,4-6,8-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrd3800 | [A] - IRMLER M ET AL, "Granzyme A is an interleukin 1 beta-converting enzyme", THE JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, ROCKEFELLER UNIVERSITY PRESS, US, (19950501), vol. 181, no. 5, doi:10.1084/JEM.181.5.1917, ISSN 0022-1007, pages 1917 - 1922, XP002671415 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.181.5.1917 | [A] - MOHAMMED F. SHAMJI ET AL, "Development and characterization of a fusion protein between thermally responsive elastin-like polypeptide and interleukin-1 receptor antagonist: Sustained release of a local antiinflammatory therapeutic", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, US, (20071101), vol. 56, no. 11, doi:10.1002/art.22952, ISSN 0004-3591, pages 3650 - 3661, XP055322297 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/art.22952 | [T] - PELEG RIDER ET AL, "IL-1 Receptor Antagonist Chimeric Protein: Context-Specific and Inflammation-Restricted Activation", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, US, (20150708), vol. 195, no. 4, doi:10.4049/jimmunol.1501168, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 1705 - 1712, XP055322288 [T] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.1501168 | International search | [A]WO03068934 (RUTTER WILLIAM J [US]) [A] 1-27 * The whole document *; | [A]WO2009077755 (QUEEN MARY & WESTFIELD COLLEGE [GB], et al) [A] 1-27* The whole document *; | [A]WO2011028344 (AMUNIX OPERATING INC [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * The whole document *; | [A] - DINARELLO C.A., "Interleukin-1, interleukin-1 receptors and interleukin-1 receptor antagonist.", Int Rev Immunol., vol. 16, no. 5-6, (19980000), pages 457 - 499., URL: http://informahealthcare.com/doi/abs/10.3109/08830189809043005, (20140910), XP001059110 [A] 1-27 * The whole document, especially page 464, second paragraph, FIG 1, page 479, first paragraph * |