EP3003530 - DRY FORMED FILTERS AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.06.2017 [2017/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gusmer Enterprises, Inc. 1404 Ware Street Waupaca, Wisconsin 54981 / US | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TINKHAM, Robert L. 1430 N. Rankin Street Appleton, Wisconsin 54911 / US | 02 /
MENZIES, Robert 926 White Oak Drive Waupaca, Wisconsin 54981 / US | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2016/15] | Application number, filing date | 14808255.5 | 04.06.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014US40842 | Priority number, date | US201361831769P | 06.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361831769 P | US201461981663P | 18.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461981663 P | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014197555 | Date: | 11.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3003530 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 11.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/22, B01D39/16 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
B01D39/1623 (EP,US);
B01D39/02 (US);
B01D39/163 (EP,US);
B32B5/22 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
B01D2239/04 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0407 (EP,US);
B01D2239/045 (EP,US);
B01D2239/065 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | B01D39/08, B32B5/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Title | German: | TROCKEN GEFORMTE FILTER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2016/15] | English: | DRY FORMED FILTERS AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME | [2016/15] | French: | FILTRES FORMÉS À SEC ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 01.05.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2008223776 (SUMIAN CHRYSLIAN [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9,14 * paragraphs [0039] , [0052] , [0053]; figures 1,3; claim - * [Y] 1-3,7-9,11,14 [I] 4-6,10-13,15; | [Y]WO2009088648 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,7-9,14 * 3. Optional Support Layer;; claim - *; | [Y]WO2010118112 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,7-9,11,14* paragraphs [0056] , [0065]; claim - * | International search | [Y]GB1311923 (RHONE PROGIL) [Y] 132-138 * , abstract *; | [Y]JPH01269480 (IWAO JIKI KOGYO) [Y] 39 * , abstract *; | [Y]US4988440 (BERNARD ROBIN D [US], et al) [Y] 7-11, 19-21, 27, 40, 45-48, 75-79 * , abstract *; | [Y]JPH07136429 (JAPAN VILENE CO LTD) [Y] 139-162* , abstract *; | [Y]US5454946 (HEAGLE DAVID G [US], et al) [Y] 1-164 * , abstract, col. 14, lines 21-40, fig. 1-4 *; | [Y]US5809777 (KAWAMURA HIDEO [JP]) [Y] 16-18, 106-110 * , abstract, fig. 2 *; | [Y]US2005000890 (PEARCE CHARLES ERIC [US], et al) [Y] 34-35 * , abstract *; | [Y]US6966939 (RAMMIG JUERGEN [DE], et al) [Y] 63-65, 111-113 * , abstract, col. 3, col. 4, lines 1-18 *; | [Y]US2008223776 (SUMIAN CHRYSLIAN [FR], et al) [Y] 1-164 * , abstract, par. [0047], [0074]-[0080], fig. 1, 3 *; | [Y]JP2009173675 (MILLIPORE CORP) [Y] 13-15, 114 * , abstract, fig. la *; | [Y]US8070858 (SCHULTINK JAN [BE], et al) [Y] 6, 23, 29-32, 36, 54- 62 * , claims * |