EP3006687 - UREA SOLUTION SPRAY NOZZLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yanmar Co., Ltd. 1-32, Chayamachi Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8311 / JP | For all designated states Japan Ship Machinery & Equipment Association 13-3, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0001 / JP | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOUE Tsuyoshi c/o YANMAR CO., LTD. 1-32, Chayamachi Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8311 / JP | [2018/31] |
Former [2016/15] | 01 /
INOUE Tsuyoshi c/o YANMAR CO. LTD. 1-32, Chayamachi Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8311 / JP | Representative(s) | Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Metzgerstraße 61 52070 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/31] | Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Philipsstrasse 8 52068 Aachen / DE | ||
Former [2016/15] | Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51 52074 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 14808320.7 | 29.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014JP64321 | Priority number, date | JP20130118011 | 04.06.2013 Original published format: JP 2013118011 | [2016/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014196456 | Date: | 11.12.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3006687 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3006687 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/08, F01N3/20, F01N9/00 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
F01N3/2066 (EP,US);
F02D41/0235 (US);
B05B7/0416 (US);
B05B7/0815 (US);
F01N3/206 (US);
F01N3/208 (EP,US);
F01N3/22 (US);
F01N9/00 (EP,US);
F01N2510/00 (EP,US);
F01N2590/02 (EP,US);
F01N2610/02 (EP,US);
F01N2610/08 (EP,US);
F01N2610/085 (EP,US);
F01N2610/1453 (EP,US);
F01N2610/146 (EP,US);
F01N2900/06 (US);
F01N2900/10 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | F01N3/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINSPRITZDÜSE FÜR EINE HARNSTOFFLÖSUNG | [2018/11] | English: | UREA SOLUTION SPRAY NOZZLE | [2016/15] | French: | BUSE D'INJECTION D'UNE SOLUTION D'URÉE | [2018/11] |
Former [2016/15] | SPRÜHDÜSE FÜR EINE HARNSTOFFLÖSUNG | ||
Former [2016/15] | BUSE D'INJECTION D'URÉE-EAU | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2015 | Translation filed | 04.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 04.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 06.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.05.2014 | AL | 01.08.2018 | AT | 01.08.2018 | CY | 01.08.2018 | CZ | 01.08.2018 | EE | 01.08.2018 | ES | 01.08.2018 | HR | 01.08.2018 | IT | 01.08.2018 | LT | 01.08.2018 | LV | 01.08.2018 | MC | 01.08.2018 | MK | 01.08.2018 | MT | 01.08.2018 | PL | 01.08.2018 | RO | 01.08.2018 | RS | 01.08.2018 | SE | 01.08.2018 | SI | 01.08.2018 | SK | 01.08.2018 | SM | 01.08.2018 | TR | 01.08.2018 | BG | 01.11.2018 | NO | 01.11.2018 | GR | 02.11.2018 | IS | 01.12.2018 | PT | 01.12.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 29.05.2014 | |
AL | 01.08.2018 | ||
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CY | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
MT | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 29.05.2014 | |
AL | 01.08.2018 | ||
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CY | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CY | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | LT | 01.08.2018 | |
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 01.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04101059 (JAPAN ELECTRONIC CONTROL SYST) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]JP2009041502 (HINO MOTORS LTD) [AD] 1* abstract *; | [A]US2010116900 (WURZ DIETER [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0006] , [0079] - [0081]; figures 2,4 *; | [A]DE102011003356 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0019] - [0025]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE102011107609 (ALBONAIR GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0066]; figure - *; | [AP]WO2013191134 (YANMAR CO LTD [JP], et al) [AP] 1 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH09310660 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 3 * , paragraphs [0009], [0017]; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2003083055 (DENSO CORP) [A] 3 * , claims 11 to 13 & DE 10241697 A1 *; | [Y]JP2008019773 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0040] to [0041]; fig. 5 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2009041502 (HINO MOTORS LTD) [Y] 1-3 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0008] to [0009]; fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2011080437 (YANMAR CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1-3 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0032] to [0036]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) *; | [PA]WO2013191134 (YANMAR CO LTD [JP], et al) [PA] 1-3* , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2009041502 |