EP3074711 - DUAL-FLOW AIR/AIR EXCHANGER, APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING AIR AND METHOD FOR PROTECTING SUCH AN EXCHANGER AGAINST ICE AND FOR CLEANING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F2A - FABRICATION AERAULIQUE ET ACOUSTIQUE 70 impasse de Barmettes ZA des 2 B 01360 Béligneux / FR | [2019/34] |
Former [2016/40] | For all designated states ELYT 3 70 Impasse des Barmettes ZA des 2 B 01360 Beligneux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIGAUD, Franck 31 Impasse des Sables F-01600 Reyrieux / FR | [2016/40] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [2016/40] | Application number, filing date | 14809316.4 | 28.11.2014 | [2016/40] | WO2014EP76017 | Priority number, date | FR20130061798 | 28.11.2013 Original published format: FR 1361798 | [2016/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015079046 | Date: | 04.06.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3074711 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F28F19/00, F24F13/14, F28F27/02, F28D9/00, F24F11/00, F24F12/00 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
F28F19/006 (EP,US);
F24F7/08 (US);
F28D9/0025 (EP,US);
F28D9/0031 (EP,US);
F28F27/02 (EP,US);
F24F11/41 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/40] | Title | German: | DOPPELFLUTIGER LUFT/LUFTWÄRMETAUSCHER, VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON LUFT UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCHUTZ SOLCH EINES WÄRMETAUSCHERS VOR EIS UND ZU DESSEN REINIGUNG | [2016/40] | English: | DUAL-FLOW AIR/AIR EXCHANGER, APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING AIR AND METHOD FOR PROTECTING SUCH AN EXCHANGER AGAINST ICE AND FOR CLEANING SAME | [2016/40] | French: | ECHANGEUR AIR/AIR À DOUBLE FLUX, INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT D'AIR ET MÉTHODE DE PROTECTION CONTRE LE GIVRE ET DE NETTOYAGE D'UN TEL ÉCHANGEUR | [2016/40] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/40] | 24.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/37] | 10.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US4102393 (WITHERS JR JAMES G) [X] 1,3 * column 1, line 49 - line 65 * [Y] 14 [I] 2,5,6,8,9; | [A]WO8002064 (THUNBERG S) [A] 4,7,10,12 * abstract * * page 6, line 3 - page 7, line 38 *; | [A]DE20209031U (TROX GMBH GEB [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2874421 (LGL FRANCE SA [FR]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]CA2509571 (IMP SHEET METAL LTD [CA]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [XAY]DE102008048405 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * [A] 4,10,12 [Y] 14; | [A]WO2010074641 (CELLOMATIC AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2597388 (AEROPULMO BESLOTEN VENNOTSCHAP MET BEPERKTE AANSPRAKELIJKHEID [BE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2983284 (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | Examination | JP2012189252 | by applicant | FR2961891 |