EP3078065 - PIEZO ACTUATOR AND CONTROL VALVE WITH SUCH A PIEZO ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROMME, Peter Theodor Heuss Ring 58 96050 Bamberg / DE | 02 /
HEDRICH, Alexander Karl-May-Strasse 30 96049 Bamberg / DE | 03 /
VENDULET, Joachim Dietmar Holbornerhof 13 67700 Niederkirchen / DE | 04 /
BENES, Jan Steinertstrasse 10 96047 Bamberg / DE | [2016/41] | Application number, filing date | 14809329.7 | 01.12.2014 | [2016/41] | WO2014EP76100 | Priority number, date | DE201310224839 | 04.12.2013 Original published format: DE102013224839 | [2016/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015082399 | Date: | 11.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3078065 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/047 | [2016/41] | CPC: |
H10N30/872 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] | Title | German: | PIEZOAKTOR UND STEUERVENTIL MIT EINEM SOLCHEN PIEZOAKTOR | [2016/41] | English: | PIEZO ACTUATOR AND CONTROL VALVE WITH SUCH A PIEZO ACTUATOR | [2016/41] | French: | ACTIONNEUR PIÉZO-ÉLECTRIQUE ET SOUPAPE DE COMMANDE ÉQUIPÉ D'UN TEL ACTIONNEUR PIÉZO-ÉLECTRIQUE | [2016/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/41] | 26.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/30] | 06.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0178158 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [XI]EP1204152 (CERAMTEC AG [DE]); | [XI]EP1239525 (CERAM TEC AG INNOVATIVE CERAMI [DE]); | [XI]JP2008243924 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) | by applicant | DE102006001134 |