EP3080614 - SAMPLE-MANIPULATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Bonaduz AG Via Crusch 8 7402 Bonaduz / CH | [2016/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFFMANN, Peter Wasserstrasse 20 18528 Bergen auf Rügen / DE | 02 /
FREY, Martin Untere Burgwies 23 CH-8864 Reichenburg / CH | 03 /
ZAHNER, Beat Kengelwiesstrasse 2 CH-8722 Kaltbrunn / CH | 04 /
TAPPE, Petra Sonnenstutz 12 CH-7000 Chur / CH | [2016/42] | Representative(s) | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | [2023/39] |
Former [2016/42] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14809378.4 | 05.12.2014 | [2016/42] | WO2014EP76673 | Priority number, date | DE201310114041 | 13.12.2013 Original published format: DE102013114041 | [2016/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015086445 | Date: | 18.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3080614 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3080614 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/02, B01L3/00, // G01N35/04, B01L9/00 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
B01L3/50825 (EP,US);
G01N35/04 (US);
G01N35/00732 (US);
G01N35/028 (EP,US);
B01L9/523 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00801 (US);
G01N2035/0405 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/42] | G01N35/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROBENMANIPULATIONSEINRICHTUNG | [2016/42] | English: | SAMPLE-MANIPULATING DEVICE | [2016/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MANIPULATION D'ÉCHANTILLONS | [2016/42] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/42] | 25.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 27.09.2023 | DK | 27.09.2023 | EE | 27.09.2023 | ES | 27.09.2023 | FI | 27.09.2023 | IT | 27.09.2023 | LT | 27.09.2023 | LV | 27.09.2023 | NL | 27.09.2023 | PL | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SE | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | NO | 27.12.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | PT | 29.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 27.09.2023 | |
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 27.09.2023 | |
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 27.09.2023 | |
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 27.09.2023 | |
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1640723 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-21 * figure 2 ** claim 1 *; | [XI]WO2012059701 (CYBIO FRANCE SARL [FR], et al) [X] 1-8,18 * figures 2,3 * * page 16, line 8 - page 9, line 2 * [I] 9-17,19-21 | Examination | WO2006111634 |