EP3063299 - PROCESS AND KIT FOR THE IDENTIFICATION OF A DOG BY ANALYSIS OF A BIOLOGICAL SAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/36] | METHOD AND KIT FOR IDENTIFYING A DOG BY ANALYSING A BIOLOGICAL SAMPLE | ||
[2018/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Doutremepuich, Christian Laboratoire d'Analyses Médicales 43 avenue de la République Caud 33200 Bordeaux / FR | [2016/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEAUFILS, Martine 30 Lavergne F-33230 Les Eglisottes / FR | 02 /
DOUTREMEPUICH, Christian 290 avenue d'Arès F-33700 Mérignac / FR | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | IP Trust 2, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [2016/36] | Application number, filing date | 14809446.9 | 31.10.2014 | [2016/36] | WO2014FR52776 | Priority number, date | FR20130060713 | 31.10.2013 Original published format: FR 1360713 | [2016/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015063429 | Date: | 07.05.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3063299 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3063299 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6888, C12Q1/6879 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6888 (EP);
C12Q1/6879 (EP);
C12Q2600/156 (EP);
C12Q2600/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/36] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND KIT ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINES HUNDES BEI ANALYSE EINER BIOLOGISCHEN PROBE | [2018/42] | English: | PROCESS AND KIT FOR THE IDENTIFICATION OF A DOG BY ANALYSIS OF A BIOLOGICAL SAMPLE | [2018/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET KIT D'IDENTIFICATION D'UN CHIEN PAR L'ANALYSE D'UN ÉCHANTILLON BIOLOGIQUE | [2016/36] |
Former [2016/36] | VERFAHREN UND KIT ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINES HUNDES DURCH ANALYSE EINER BIOLOGISCHEN PROBE | ||
Former [2016/36] | METHOD AND KIT FOR IDENTIFYING A DOG BY ANALYSING A BIOLOGICAL SAMPLE | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 07.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2014 | AL | 27.02.2019 | AT | 27.02.2019 | CY | 27.02.2019 | CZ | 27.02.2019 | DK | 27.02.2019 | EE | 27.02.2019 | ES | 27.02.2019 | FI | 27.02.2019 | HR | 27.02.2019 | IT | 27.02.2019 | LT | 27.02.2019 | LV | 27.02.2019 | MK | 27.02.2019 | MT | 27.02.2019 | NL | 27.02.2019 | PL | 27.02.2019 | RO | 27.02.2019 | RS | 27.02.2019 | SE | 27.02.2019 | SI | 27.02.2019 | SK | 27.02.2019 | SM | 27.02.2019 | TR | 27.02.2019 | BG | 27.05.2019 | NO | 27.05.2019 | GR | 28.05.2019 | IS | 27.06.2019 | PT | 27.06.2019 | CH | 31.10.2019 | IE | 31.10.2019 | LI | 31.10.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 31.10.2014 | |
AL | 27.02.2019 | ||
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
IE | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 31.10.2014 | |
AL | 27.02.2019 | ||
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
IE | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
IE | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
IE | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 27.02.2019 | |
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 27.02.2019 | |
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0029615 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [A] 1-22 * sequences 125,126,649,650,677,678,713,714,735,754 * * tables 1,2 *; | [A]US2004146915 (FERRIE BONITA J M [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * paragraphs [0044] , [0068] , [0072] - [0078] - [0095] , [0096] , [0103] * * figures 2-4 * * tables 4, 5 *; | [A]US2008295191 (LEE BYEONG CHUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0086] * * table 7 * * sequences 9,10,15,16,19-28 *; | [XYI]US2013071847 (BURNETT ASHLEY MICHELLE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,16-18 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 4] , [0 10] , [0 11] , [0 13] , [0 17] , [0 18] , [0 21] , [0 38] - [0058] * * tables 1, 2 * [Y] 4,8,13,15 [I] 5-7,9-12,14,19-22; | [Y] - B. BERGER ET AL, "Validation of two canine STR multiplex-assays following the ISFG recommendations for non-human DNA analysis", FORENSIC SCIENCE INTERNATIONAL: GENETICS, (20130907), vol. 8, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.fsigen.2013.07.002, ISSN 1872-4973, pages 90 - 100, XP055125235 [Y] 4 * abstract * * table 1 * * page 91, column l, paragraph 2.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fsigen.2013.07.002 | [Y] - BRADLEY K. TOM ET AL, "Development of a Nomenclature System for a Canine STR Multiplex Reagent Kit", JOURNAL OF FORENSIC SCIENCES, (20100501), vol. 55, no. 3, doi:10.1111/j.1556-4029.2010.01361.x, ISSN 0022-1198, pages 597 - 604, XP055125237 [Y] 8,13 * abstract * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1556-4029.2010.01361.x | [Y] - GÜNTHER SCHARNHORST ET AL, "An assessment of scientific and technical aspects of closed investigations of canine forensics DNA - case series from the University of California, Davis, USA", CROATIAN MEDICAL JOURNAL, (20110601), vol. 52, no. 3, doi:10.3325/cmj.2011.52.280, ISSN 0353-9504, pages 280 - 292, XP055125258 [Y] 15 * table 1 * * page 283, column l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3325/cmj.2011.52.280 | [XP] - "Reportage TV7 mallette Hygène", (20141006), URL: http://www.animagene.fr/actualites-analyse-genetique-adn-animale/actualites-hygene/reportage-tv7/, (20150318), XP054975792 [XP] 19 * the whole document * | [A] - A. AASPÕLLU ET AL, "The first criminal case in Estonia with dog's DNA data admitted as evidence", INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS SERIES, (20030101), vol. 1239, doi:10.1016/S0531-5131(02)00224-8, ISSN 0531-5131, pages 847 - 851, XP055125230 [A] 1-22 * pages 848-849, paragraphs 2, 3.1-3.3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0531-5131(02)00224-8 | [A] - BERGER C ET AL, "Sequence analysis of the canine mitochondrial DNA control region from shed hair samples in criminal investigations", METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, HUMANA PRESS, INC, US, (20120101), vol. 830, doi:10.1007/978-1-61779-461-2_23, ISSN 1940-6029, pages 331 - 348, XP009178683 [A] 1-22 * abstract * * pages 336-337, paragraphs 3.3, 3.4, 3.6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-1-61779-461-2_23 | [A] - Anonymous, "AmpFlSTR COfiler PCR Amplification Kit", (20120801), Applied Biosystems, URL: https://www3.appliedbiosystems.com/cms/groups/applied_markets_support/documents/generaldocuments/cms_041009.pdf, (20140625), XP055125232 [A] 1-22 * page 2, paragraph 1er * * page 3; table . * * page 6; table . * * page 17, paragraph 2ème * | [A] - TERI KUN ET AL, "Developmental validation of Mini-DogFiler for degraded canine DNA", FORENSIC SCIENCE INTERNATIONAL: GENETICS, (20121004), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.fsigen.2012.09.002, ISSN 1872-4973, pages 151 - 158, XP055125256 [A] 1-22 * abstract * * table 1 * * page 152, paragraph 2.4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fsigen.2012.09.002 | [A] - YVONNE MARSCHALL ET AL, "Mapping quantitative trait loci for canine hip dysplasia in German Shepherd dogs", MAMMALIAN GENOME, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NE, (20071120), vol. 18, no. 12, doi:10.1007/S00335-007-9071-Z, ISSN 1432-1777, pages 861 - 870, XP019561881 [A] 1-22 * page 863 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00335-007-9071-z | [ ] - Yvonne Marschall ET AL, "Mapping quantitative trait loci for canine hip dysplasia in German Shepherd dogs: online supplementary material", Mammalian Genome, (20071201), URL: http://rd.springer.com/article/10.1007%2Fs00335-007-9071-z, (20140626), XP055125267 [ ] * table . * | [A] - J. ECHEGARAY ET AL, "Noninvasive monitoring of wolves at the edge of their distribution and the cost of their conservation", ANIMAL CONSERVATION, (20100401), vol. 13, no. 2, doi:10.1111/j.1469-1795.2009.00315.x, ISSN 1367-9430, pages 157 - 161, XP055043022 [A] 1-22 * abstract * * pages 158-159 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1469-1795.2009.00315.x | by applicant | WO9713876 | US2004146915 | - HALVERSON J.; BASTEN C., "A PCR multoplex and database for forensic DNA identification of dogs", J FORENSIC SCI., (200503), vol. 50, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1520/JFS2004207, pages 352 - 63, XP009178657 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1520/JFS2004207 | - TOM B. K. ET AL., "Development of a nomenclature system for a canine STR multiplex reagent kit", J FORENSIC SCI., (201005), vol. 55, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1556-4029.2010.01361.x, pages 597 - 604, XP055125237 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1556-4029.2010.01361.x | - WICTUM E. ET AL., "Development validation of dogfiler, a novel multiplex for canine DNA profiling in forensic casework", FORENSIC SCI INT GENET., (201301), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/j.fsigen.2012.07.001, pages 82 - 91, XP028959171 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fsigen.2012.07.001 |