EP3007824 - RNA/PROTEIN/DNA PREFERENTIAL FLUID SAMPLE COLLECTION SYSTEM AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oasis Diagnostics Corporation 15720 NE 31st Avenue Vancouver, WA 98686 / US | [2016/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLOWEY, Paul, D. 15720 Ne 31st Avenue Vancouver, WA 98686 / US | 02 /
BUCK, Robert, L. 15720 Ne 31st Avenue Vancouver, WA 98686 / US | 03 /
LAUGHLIN, Mary 15720 Ne 31st Avenue Vancouver, WA 98686 / US | [2016/16] | Representative(s) | Spencer, Michael David Bromhead Johnson LLP 57-59 High Street Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | Spencer, Michael David Bromhead Johnson Sovereign House 212-224 Shaftesbury Avenue London WC2H 8HQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14810136.3 | 12.06.2014 | [2016/16] | WO2014US42203 | Priority number, date | US201361834363P | 12.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361834363 P | [2016/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014201307 | Date: | 18.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3007824 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, A61B10/00 | [2017/07] | CPC: |
B01L3/5635 (EP,US);
G01N1/405 (US);
A61B10/0051 (EP,US);
C12N15/1006 (EP,US);
G01N1/4005 (EP,US);
G01N1/4077 (EP,US);
A61B10/007 (EP,US);
A61B2010/0074 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0631 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0681 (EP,US);
B01L2300/069 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0864 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0478 (EP,US);
B01L3/502 (EP,US);
B01L3/5082 (EP,US);
G01N2001/4088 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/16] | B01L3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] | Title | German: | RNA/PROTEIN/DNA-PRÄFERENTIELLES FLUIDPROBENAHMESYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2016/16] | English: | RNA/PROTEIN/DNA PREFERENTIAL FLUID SAMPLE COLLECTION SYSTEM AND METHODS | [2016/16] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉS DE COLLECTE D'ÉCHANTILLONS DE FLUIDE PRÉFÉRENTIELS POUR ARN/PROTÉINES/ADN | [2016/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/16] | 15.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 20.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0053807 (WHATMAN INC [US], et al) [A] 1,3,6,9,13,18,28* page 4, lines 22-24 *; | [XY]WO2010131140 (DIAGCOR BIOSCIENCE INC LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1,3,6,9,13,18 * page 7, line 24 - page 8, line 3; figures 1,2,2A * * page 8, line 20 * * page 14, lines 5-9 * [Y] 28; | [XY]US2012067144 (SLOWEY PAUL [US], et al) [X] 24-26,30 * paragraphs [0052] , [ 0023] , [ 0044]; figures 1, 9 * [Y] 10,19,27-29; | [XYI]WO2013020137 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9,11,14-17,20-22 * paragraphs [0037] , [ 0081] , [ 0082]; figure 13 * [Y] 10,19,27,29 [I] 5,12,23 | International search | [Y]US5855784 (PIKE RICHARD DANIEL [US], et al); | [X]US2009306543 (SLOWEY PAUL D [US], et al); | [Y]US2010331725 (LIBBY BRIAN JOSEPH [US], et al); | [Y]WO2013020137 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) |