EP3008478 - NON-TECHNICAL LOSSES IN A POWER DISTRIBUTION GRID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRC Companies, Inc. 21 Griffin Road North Windsor, CT 06095 / US | For all designated states Dominion Energy Technologies Inc. 120 Tredegar Street Richmond, Virginia 23219 / US | [2020/15] |
Former [2020/02] | For all designated states Lockheed Martin Corporation 6801 Rockledge Drive Bethesda, Maryland 20817 / US | ||
For all designated states Dominion Energy Technologies Inc. 120 Tredegar Street Richmond, Virginia 23219 / US | |||
Former [2016/16] | For all designated states Astrolink International LLC 6801 Rockledge Drive Bethesda, Maryland 20817 / US | ||
For all designated states Dominion Energy Technologies Inc. 120 Tredegar Street Richmond, Virginia 23219 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNHEIM, Henrick F. 7777 East 1st Place 109 Denver, Colorado 80230 / US | 02 /
HANSELL, Jerritt H. 4625 Pitkin Drive Boulder, Colorado 80303 / US | 03 /
MARTIN, Marcia Reid 1209 S. Emery Street Longmont, Colorado 80501 / US | [2016/16] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | Boyce, Conor, et al Hanna Moore + Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2, D02 T668 / IE | Application number, filing date | 14810273.4 | 13.06.2014 | [2016/16] | WO2014US42300 | Priority number, date | US201361834567P | 13.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361834567 P | [2016/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014201348 | Date: | 18.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3008478 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01R22/06, // G01R19/25 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
G01R22/066 (EP,US);
G01R19/2513 (EP,US);
G01R22/063 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/16] | G01R22/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] | Title | German: | NICHTTECHNISCHE VERLUSTE IN EINEM STROMVERTEILUNGSNETZ | [2016/16] | English: | NON-TECHNICAL LOSSES IN A POWER DISTRIBUTION GRID | [2016/16] | French: | PERTES NON TECHNIQUES DANS UN RÉSEAU DE DISTRIBUTION D'ÉLECTRICITÉ | [2016/16] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/16] | 28.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2019 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 07.01.2020 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 01.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/49] | 30.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   18.12.2020 | 30.06.2021 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009067250 (TRILLIANT NETWORKS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010007336 (DE BUDA ERIC GEORGE [CA]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2012062210 (VEILLETTE MICHEL [CA]); | [Y]EP2566125 (NAGRAVISION SA [CH]); | [Y]US2009210197 (CLEARY SIMON [AU]); | [Y]EP0629098 (LOGICA UK LTD [GB]); | [Y]EP1901145 (MICRONET SENSORIK GMBH [DE]); | [Y]CN101770007 (SHENZHEN KELU ELECTRONIC TECHN); | [Y]US2012232915 (BROMBERGER SETH [US]) |