Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10006143 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2018 | B2 | US2016108540 | 21.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014JP65050 | 06.06.2014 | JP2013125556 | 14.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105308222B | Global Dossier | 13.03.2018 | B | CN105308222 | 03.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014JP65050 | 06.06.2014 | JP2013125556 | 14.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3009536 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2017 | A4 | EP3009536 | 20.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014JP65050 | 06.06.2014 | JP2013125556 | 14.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015029937 | 31.12.2019 | A8 | BR112015029937 | 25.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014JP65050 | 06.06.2014 | JP2013125556 | 14.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2015016099 | 24.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014JP65050 | 06.06.2014 | JP2013125556 | 14.06.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014199908 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013125556 | 14.06.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6189656B | Global Dossier | 30.08.2017 | B2 | JP2015001006 | 05.01.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2013125556 | 14.06.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI646224B | 01.01.2019 | B | TW201510289 | 16.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2013125556 | 14.06.2013 |