EP3009536 - POWER-SUPPLY MEMBER, AND HIGH-SPEED PLATING DEVICE PROVIDED WITH SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYB Corporation World Trade Center Building 4-1, Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6111 / JP | [2016/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOCHIZUKI, Yoshitaka c/o KAYABA INDUSTRY CO. LTD. World Trade Center Bldg. 4-1 Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6111 / JP | 02 /
MIYAZAKI, Toshihisa c/o CHUO SEISAKUSHO LTD. 24-1 Uchihama-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8563 / JP | 03 /
TAKAMATSU, Akira c/o CHUO SEISAKUSHO LTD. 24-1 Uchihama-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8563 / JP | [2016/16] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2016/16] | Application number, filing date | 14810276.7 | 06.06.2014 | [2016/16] | WO2014JP65050 | Priority number, date | JP20130125556 | 14.06.2013 Original published format: JP 2013125556 | [2016/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014199908 | Date: | 18.12.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3009536 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C25D17/10, C25D21/00, C25D17/00, C25D7/00, C25D17/06 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
C25D17/007 (EP,US);
C25D17/005 (EP,US);
C25D17/06 (EP,US);
C25D17/10 (EP,US);
C25D17/12 (EP,US);
C25D21/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/16] | C25D17/10, C25D21/00, C25D17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] | Title | German: | STROMVERSORGUNGSELEMENT UND HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITSPLATTIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2016/16] | English: | POWER-SUPPLY MEMBER, AND HIGH-SPEED PLATING DEVICE PROVIDED WITH SAME | [2016/16] | French: | ÉLÉMENT D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE ET DISPOSITIF DE PLACAGE À HAUTE VITESSE ÉQUIPÉ DE CELUI-CI | [2016/16] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2015 | Translation filed | 19.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/16] | 18.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3649477 (BART SIEGFRIED G) [X] 1-3 * column 6, lines 7-32; figure 7 * * column 3, line 45 - column 9, line 74; figures 1-11 *; | [A]US4543172 (SUZUKI TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3* the whole document *; | [X]US4948486 (HOSTEN DANIEL [BE]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, lines 48-59; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0848765 (ELECTROPLATING TECHNOLOGIES LT [US]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0047] , [0048]; figure 19 * | International search | [Y]JPS62164899 (TANAKA PRECIOUS METAL IND); | [Y]JPH0931686 (TOSHIBA CORP) | by applicant | JPS55138097 |